EP1413732 - A method and device for controlling black smoke in a diesel engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.12.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2011 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 10.08.2011 [2011/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Iveco Motorenforschung AG Schlossgasse 9320 Arbon / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2004/18] | For all designated states Iveco Motorenforschung AG Schlossgasse CH-9320 Arbon / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Spuler, Juerg Ebnet 9315 Neukirch / CH | 02 /
Jaeger, Laurentius W. Flurstrasse 30 F 605 8048 Zuerich / CH | 03 /
Montali, Leonardo Alpenblickweg 17 9320 Arbon / CH | [2004/18] | Representative(s) | Gervasi, Gemma Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | Gervasi, Gemma Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria 9 20122 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2004/18] | Gervasi, Gemma, Dr. Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A., Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 03024199.6 | 21.10.2003 | [2004/18] | Priority number, date | IT2002TO00929 | 25.10.2002 Original published format: IT TO20020929 | [2004/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1413732 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1413732 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/38 | [2004/18] | CPC: |
F02D41/3827 (EP);
F02D41/1458 (EP);
F02D41/2409 (EP);
F02D2200/0402 (EP);
F02D2200/0602 (EP);
F02D2250/32 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/18] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Steuerung der Schwarzrauchemission für Dieselmotoren | [2004/18] | English: | A method and device for controlling black smoke in a diesel engine | [2004/18] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour commander l'émission des fumées noires pour un moteur diesel | [2004/18] | Examination procedure | 25.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/52] | 31.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.02.2007 | BE | 21.02.2007 | CY | 21.02.2007 | CZ | 21.02.2007 | DK | 21.02.2007 | EE | 21.02.2007 | FI | 21.02.2007 | NL | 21.02.2007 | RO | 21.02.2007 | SI | 21.02.2007 | SK | 21.02.2007 | TR | 21.02.2007 | BG | 22.05.2007 | GR | 22.05.2007 | PT | 23.07.2007 | HU | 22.08.2007 | LU | 21.10.2007 | MC | 31.10.2007 | [2011/32] |
Former [2009/43] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
BE | 21.02.2007 | ||
CY | 21.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
EE | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
RO | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
TR | 21.02.2007 | ||
BG | 22.05.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
HU | 22.08.2007 | ||
IT | 21.10.2007 | ||
LU | 21.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2009/38] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
BE | 21.02.2007 | ||
CY | 21.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
EE | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
RO | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
BG | 22.05.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
IT | 21.10.2007 | ||
LU | 21.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
BE | 21.02.2007 | ||
CY | 21.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
EE | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
RO | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
BG | 22.05.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
IT | 21.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
BE | 21.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
EE | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
RO | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
BG | 22.05.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
IT | 21.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/26] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
BE | 21.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
RO | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
BG | 22.05.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
IT | 21.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
BE | 21.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
RO | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
BG | 22.05.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
IT | 21.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
BE | 21.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
RO | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
BG | 22.05.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/02] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
BE | 21.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
BG | 22.05.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
BE | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
BG | 22.05.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
BE | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
BG | 22.05.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
BG | 22.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/40] | FI | 21.02.2007 | |
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
BG | 22.05.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4841936 (TAKAHASHI TAKESHI [JP]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * column 6, line 35 - column 10, line 55 *; | [A]EP0620364 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [X]EP1164274 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraphs [0024] - [0026] * * paragraphs [0043] - [0051]; figure 10 * |