EP1428723 - Exterior rear view mirror for a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.2008 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr. Ing. h.c. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porscheplatz 1 70435 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | For all designated states Dr. Ing. h.c. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porscheplatz 1 70435 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2008/20] | For all designated states Dr. Ing. h.c. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porschestrasse 71287 Weissach / DE | ||
Former [2007/36] | For all designated states Dr.Ing. h.c. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porscheplatz 1 70435 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2004/25] | For all designated states Dr.Ing. H.C. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porscheplatz 1 70435 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Körner, Gabi Pichlerstrasse 4/4 75446 Wiernsheim / DE | 02 /
Robinson, Hugh Alte Weinsteige 7 70180 Stuttgart / DE | [2004/25] | Application number, filing date | 03024263.0 | 23.10.2003 | [2004/25] | Priority number, date | DE20021057983 | 12.12.2002 Original published format: DE 10257983 | [2004/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1428723 | Date: | 16.06.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1428723 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B60R1/06 | [2004/25] | CPC: |
B60R1/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/10] |
Former [2004/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Aussenrückblickspiegel für ein Kraftfahrzeug | [2004/25] | English: | Exterior rear view mirror for a motor vehicle | [2004/25] | French: | Rétroviseur extérieur pour une véhicule a moteur | [2004/25] | Examination procedure | 16.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/06] | 02.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4394066 (SHARP BERNARD C) [X] 1-4,6,7 * column 3, paragraph L; figures 1,3 * * column 4, lines 24-47 * * column 5, paragraph L; figures 1,3 * [Y] 5; | [DA]US4759620 (SAKUMA TSUTOMU [JP], et al) [DA] 6* figures 3,6,13,14 *; | [DY]US5268797 (SANTO ANTONIO F DO E [BR]) [DY] 5 * figure 4 *; | [X]US5483385 (BODDY IAN [US]) [X] 1,3 * column 2, line 16 - column 3, line 17; figures 1,3 * |