blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1389475

EP1389475 - Process for controlling sodium concentration in a dialysate as prescribed [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.03.2007
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip31.07.2015Change - lapse in a contracting statepublished on 02.09.2015  [2015/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gambro Industries SAS
7, Avenue Lionel Terray
69330 Meyzieu / FR
[2005/36]
Former [2004/08]For all designated states
HOSPAL INDUSTRIE
7, Avenue Lionel Terray, BP 126
F-69883 Meyzieu Cédex / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Bene, Bernard
35, Rue de la Visina
69540 Irigny / FR
 [2004/08]
Representative(s)Sutto, Luca
Gambro Intellectual Property Department
P.O. Box 98
41037 Mirandola (MO) / IT
[N/P]
Former [2004/39]Sutto, Luca
Gambro Intellectual Property Department, P.O. Box 98
41037 Mirandola (MO) / IT
Former [2004/08]Sutto, Luca
Gambro Intellectual Property Department Hospal International Marketing Management 61, avenue Tony Garnier
69007 Lyon / FR
Application number, filing date03024490.907.08.1998
[2004/08]
Priority number, dateFR1997001067121.08.1997         Original published format: FR 9710671
[2004/08]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1389475
Date:18.02.2004
Language:FR
[2004/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1389475
Date:25.02.2004
[2004/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1389475
Date:17.05.2006
Language:FR
[2006/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.01.2004
ClassificationIPC:A61M1/16
[2004/08]
CPC:
A61M1/16 (EP,US); A61M1/1607 (EP,US); A61M1/1609 (EP,US);
A61M1/165 (EP,US); A61M1/3437 (EP,US); A61M1/3458 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3317 (EP,US); A61M2205/3324 (EP,US); A61M2205/3393 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2004/08]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Kontrolle der Natriumkonzentration eines Dialysats nach Verordnung[2004/08]
English:Process for controlling sodium concentration in a dialysate as prescribed[2004/08]
French:Procédé pour régler la concentration du sodium dans un liquide de dialyse en vue d'une prescription[2004/09]
Former [2004/08]Procede pour regler la concentration du sodium dans un liquide de dialyse en vue d'une prescription
Examination procedure22.05.2004Examination requested  [2004/30]
31.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.10.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.01.2006Fee for grant paid
13.01.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP98420143.4  / EP0898975
Opposition(s)20.02.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
24.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
24.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
24.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
06.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
08.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT17.05.2006
NL17.05.2006
SE17.08.2006
BE31.08.2006
CH31.08.2006
LI31.08.2006
[2015/36]
Former [2007/45]AT17.05.2006
NL17.05.2006
SE17.08.2006
BE31.08.2006
CH31.08.2006
LI31.08.2006
Former [2007/40]AT17.05.2006
IT17.05.2006
NL17.05.2006
SE17.08.2006
BE31.08.2006
CH31.08.2006
LI31.08.2006
Former [2007/30]AT17.05.2006
NL17.05.2006
SE17.08.2006
BE31.08.2006
CH31.08.2006
LI31.08.2006
Former [2007/19]AT17.05.2006
NL17.05.2006
SE17.08.2006
Former [2006/52]AT17.05.2006
SE17.08.2006
Former [2006/48]SE17.08.2006
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No Search
by applicantEP0658352
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.