EP1458065 - Three stage fiber amplifier with transient automatic gain or level control and input signal power detector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, FR | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Electronics and Telecommunications Research Institute 161 Gajeong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-350 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/32] | For all designated states ELECTRONICS AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS RESEARCH INSTITUTE 161 Gajeong-dong, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-350 / KR | ||
Former [2004/38] | For all designated states Electronics and Telecommunications Research Institute 161 Gajeong-dong, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-350 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chang, Sun-Hyok Hana Apt. 110-1101 Sinseong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon-city / KR | 02 /
Chung, Hee-Sang Expo Apt. 106-102 464-1, Jeonmin-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon-city / KR | 03 /
Han, Jin-Soo Hanvin Apt. 125-1505 Eoeun-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon-city / KR | 04 /
Kim, Seung-Kwan Hanmaeul Apt. 102-601 Songkang-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon-city / KR | 05 /
Lee, Won-Kyoung 27-32, Sajik-dong Dongrae-gu Busan-city / KR | 06 /
Chu, Moo-Jung 397-17, Doryong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon-city / KR | [2004/38] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/38] | Betten & Resch Patentanwälte, Theatinerstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03024542.7 | 27.10.2003 | [2004/38] | Priority number, date | KR20030016113 | 14.03.2003 Original published format: KR 2003016113 | [2004/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1458065 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1458065 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/10, H04B10/17 | [2004/38] | CPC: |
H04B10/296 (EP,US);
G02B6/00 (KR);
H01S3/06758 (EP,US);
H01S3/1001 (EP,US);
H01S2301/04 (EP,US);
H01S3/0078 (EP,US);
H01S3/0941 (EP,US);
H01S3/10015 (EP,US);
H01S3/10069 (EP,US);
H01S3/1305 (EP,US);
H01S3/1608 (EP,US);
H01S3/2375 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/38] | Title | German: | Dreistufiger Faserverstärker mit transienter, automatischer Kontrolle der Verstärkung oder Signalhöhe und Detektion der Eingangssignalhöhe | [2004/38] | English: | Three stage fiber amplifier with transient automatic gain or level control and input signal power detector | [2004/38] | French: | Amplificateur à fibre à trois étages avec un réglage transitoire et automatique d'amplification ou du niveau d'un signal et détection de la puissance d'un signal d'entrée | [2004/38] | Examination procedure | 14.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/19] | 17.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.08.2006 | BE | 09.08.2006 | CH | 09.08.2006 | CY | 09.08.2006 | CZ | 09.08.2006 | EE | 09.08.2006 | FI | 09.08.2006 | FR | 09.08.2006 | IT | 09.08.2006 | LI | 09.08.2006 | NL | 09.08.2006 | RO | 09.08.2006 | SI | 09.08.2006 | SK | 09.08.2006 | TR | 09.08.2006 | IE | 27.10.2006 | LU | 27.10.2006 | MC | 31.10.2006 | BG | 09.11.2006 | DK | 09.11.2006 | SE | 09.11.2006 | GR | 10.11.2006 | ES | 20.11.2006 | PT | 09.01.2007 | HU | 10.02.2007 | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 09.08.2006 | |
BE | 09.08.2006 | ||
CH | 09.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 09.08.2006 | ||
EE | 09.08.2006 | ||
FI | 09.08.2006 | ||
IT | 09.08.2006 | ||
LI | 09.08.2006 | ||
NL | 09.08.2006 | ||
RO | 09.08.2006 | ||
SI | 09.08.2006 | ||
SK | 09.08.2006 | ||
TR | 09.08.2006 | ||
IE | 27.10.2006 | ||
LU | 27.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 09.11.2006 | ||
DK | 09.11.2006 | ||
SE | 09.11.2006 | ||
GR | 10.11.2006 | ||
ES | 20.11.2006 | ||
PT | 09.01.2007 | ||
HU | 10.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/32] | AT | 09.08.2006 | |
BE | 09.08.2006 | ||
CH | 09.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 09.08.2006 | ||
EE | 09.08.2006 | ||
FI | 09.08.2006 | ||
IT | 09.08.2006 | ||
LI | 09.08.2006 | ||
NL | 09.08.2006 | ||
RO | 09.08.2006 | ||
SI | 09.08.2006 | ||
SK | 09.08.2006 | ||
IE | 27.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 09.11.2006 | ||
DK | 09.11.2006 | ||
SE | 09.11.2006 | ||
GR | 10.11.2006 | ||
ES | 20.11.2006 | ||
PT | 09.01.2007 | ||
HU | 10.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 09.08.2006 | |
BE | 09.08.2006 | ||
CH | 09.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 09.08.2006 | ||
EE | 09.08.2006 | ||
FI | 09.08.2006 | ||
IT | 09.08.2006 | ||
LI | 09.08.2006 | ||
NL | 09.08.2006 | ||
RO | 09.08.2006 | ||
SI | 09.08.2006 | ||
SK | 09.08.2006 | ||
IE | 27.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 09.11.2006 | ||
DK | 09.11.2006 | ||
SE | 09.11.2006 | ||
GR | 10.11.2006 | ||
ES | 20.11.2006 | ||
PT | 09.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 09.08.2006 | |
BE | 09.08.2006 | ||
CH | 09.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 09.08.2006 | ||
FI | 09.08.2006 | ||
IT | 09.08.2006 | ||
LI | 09.08.2006 | ||
NL | 09.08.2006 | ||
RO | 09.08.2006 | ||
SI | 09.08.2006 | ||
SK | 09.08.2006 | ||
IE | 27.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 09.11.2006 | ||
DK | 09.11.2006 | ||
SE | 09.11.2006 | ||
GR | 10.11.2006 | ||
ES | 20.11.2006 | ||
PT | 09.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | AT | 09.08.2006 | |
BE | 09.08.2006 | ||
CH | 09.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 09.08.2006 | ||
FI | 09.08.2006 | ||
IT | 09.08.2006 | ||
LI | 09.08.2006 | ||
NL | 09.08.2006 | ||
RO | 09.08.2006 | ||
SI | 09.08.2006 | ||
SK | 09.08.2006 | ||
IE | 27.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 09.11.2006 | ||
DK | 09.11.2006 | ||
SE | 09.11.2006 | ||
ES | 20.11.2006 | ||
PT | 09.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/41] | AT | 09.08.2006 | |
BE | 09.08.2006 | ||
CH | 09.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 09.08.2006 | ||
FI | 09.08.2006 | ||
IT | 09.08.2006 | ||
LI | 09.08.2006 | ||
NL | 09.08.2006 | ||
RO | 09.08.2006 | ||
SI | 09.08.2006 | ||
SK | 09.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 09.11.2006 | ||
DK | 09.11.2006 | ||
SE | 09.11.2006 | ||
ES | 20.11.2006 | ||
PT | 09.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/40] | AT | 09.08.2006 | |
BE | 09.08.2006 | ||
CH | 09.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 09.08.2006 | ||
FI | 09.08.2006 | ||
IT | 09.08.2006 | ||
LI | 09.08.2006 | ||
NL | 09.08.2006 | ||
SI | 09.08.2006 | ||
SK | 09.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 09.11.2006 | ||
DK | 09.11.2006 | ||
SE | 09.11.2006 | ||
ES | 20.11.2006 | ||
PT | 09.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 09.08.2006 | |
BE | 09.08.2006 | ||
CH | 09.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 09.08.2006 | ||
FI | 09.08.2006 | ||
LI | 09.08.2006 | ||
NL | 09.08.2006 | ||
SI | 09.08.2006 | ||
SK | 09.08.2006 | ||
BG | 09.11.2006 | ||
DK | 09.11.2006 | ||
SE | 09.11.2006 | ||
ES | 20.11.2006 | ||
PT | 09.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 09.08.2006 | |
CH | 09.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 09.08.2006 | ||
FI | 09.08.2006 | ||
LI | 09.08.2006 | ||
NL | 09.08.2006 | ||
SI | 09.08.2006 | ||
SK | 09.08.2006 | ||
BG | 09.11.2006 | ||
DK | 09.11.2006 | ||
SE | 09.11.2006 | ||
ES | 20.11.2006 | ||
PT | 09.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 09.08.2006 | |
CH | 09.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 09.08.2006 | ||
FI | 09.08.2006 | ||
LI | 09.08.2006 | ||
NL | 09.08.2006 | ||
SI | 09.08.2006 | ||
BG | 09.11.2006 | ||
DK | 09.11.2006 | ||
SE | 09.11.2006 | ||
ES | 20.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CH | 09.08.2006 | |
CZ | 09.08.2006 | ||
FI | 09.08.2006 | ||
LI | 09.08.2006 | ||
NL | 09.08.2006 | ||
SI | 09.08.2006 | ||
BG | 09.11.2006 | ||
DK | 09.11.2006 | ||
SE | 09.11.2006 | ||
ES | 20.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | CH | 09.08.2006 | |
FI | 09.08.2006 | ||
LI | 09.08.2006 | ||
NL | 09.08.2006 | ||
SI | 09.08.2006 | ||
BG | 09.11.2006 | ||
SE | 09.11.2006 | ||
ES | 20.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | CH | 09.08.2006 | |
FI | 09.08.2006 | ||
LI | 09.08.2006 | ||
SI | 09.08.2006 | ||
BG | 09.11.2006 | ||
SE | 09.11.2006 | ||
ES | 20.11.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1033834 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 3,4,6,7,10 * paragraphs [0102] - [0107]; figure 13 *; | [A]EP1187275 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 8,11,15 * paragraph [0020]; figure 3 *; | [Y]US2002054733 (KAGI NOBUYUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-21 * paragraphs [0005] , [0012] , [0042] , [0044] - [0046] - [0048] - [0050] - [0055] - [0060]; figures 1,3-6 *; | [A]US2002067538 (SUGAYA YASUSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [XY]US6466362 (FRIEDRICH LARS [US]) [X] 1,2,5,7,9 * column 3, line 41 - column 4, lines 10,60-65; figures 1,3 * * column 5, lines 12-37 * * column 6, lines 20-28 * [Y] 1-21; | [DA] - MOTOSHIMA K ET AL, "A channel-number insensitive erbium-doped fiber amplifier with automatic gain and power regulation function", JOURNAL OF LIGHTWAVE TECHNOLOGY, IEEE. NEW YORK, US, (2001), vol. 19, no. 11, ISSN 0733-8724, pages 1759 - 1767, XP002961006 [DA] 1-21 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/50.964078 |