EP1426622 - Control valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.08.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tries GmbH + Co. KG Hydraulik-Elemente Ehingen, Röntgenstrasse 10 89584 Ehingen / DE | [2008/40] |
Former [2004/24] | For all designated states Tries GmbH + Co. KG Hydraulik-Elemente Ehingen, Röntgenstrasse 10 89584 Ehingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Herzog, Robert Darrengasse 35 89614 Öpfingen / DE | 02 /
Zimmer, Thomas Goethestrasse 18 89616 Rottenacker / DE | [2004/24] | Representative(s) | Otten, Roth, Dobler & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Grosstobeler Strasse 39 88276 Berg / Ravensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Eisele, Otten, Roth & Dobler Patentanwälte Karlstrasse 8 88212 Ravensburg / DE | ||
Former [2004/24] | Patentanwälte Eisele, Dr. Otten, Dr. Roth& Dr. Dobler Karlstrasse 8 88212 Ravensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 03024674.8 | 28.10.2003 | [2004/24] | Priority number, date | DE2002155454 | 28.11.2002 Original published format: DE 10255454 | [2004/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1426622 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1426622 | Date: | 16.03.2005 | [2005/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1426622 | Date: | 01.10.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F15B13/043, F15B13/04 | [2004/24] | CPC: |
F16K11/07 (EP);
F15B13/0403 (EP);
F15B13/0435 (EP);
F16K31/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/24] | Title | German: | Steuerventil | [2004/24] | English: | Control valve | [2004/24] | French: | Distributeur de commande | [2004/24] | Examination procedure | 25.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/30] | 08.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 01.10.2008 | DK | 01.10.2008 | EE | 01.10.2008 | FI | 01.10.2008 | IE | 01.10.2008 | RO | 01.10.2008 | SI | 01.10.2008 | SK | 01.10.2008 | TR | 01.10.2008 | LU | 28.10.2008 | BE | 31.10.2008 | MC | 31.10.2008 | BG | 01.01.2009 | GR | 02.01.2009 | PT | 02.03.2009 | HU | 02.04.2009 | [2010/48] |
Former [2010/37] | CY | 01.10.2008 | |
DK | 01.10.2008 | ||
EE | 01.10.2008 | ||
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
IE | 01.10.2008 | ||
RO | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
SK | 01.10.2008 | ||
TR | 01.10.2008 | ||
LU | 28.10.2008 | ||
BE | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
HU | 02.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/34] | CY | 01.10.2008 | |
DK | 01.10.2008 | ||
EE | 01.10.2008 | ||
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
IE | 01.10.2008 | ||
RO | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
SK | 01.10.2008 | ||
LU | 28.10.2008 | ||
BE | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
HU | 02.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/32] | DK | 01.10.2008 | |
EE | 01.10.2008 | ||
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
IE | 01.10.2008 | ||
RO | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
SK | 01.10.2008 | ||
LU | 28.10.2008 | ||
BE | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | DK | 01.10.2008 | |
EE | 01.10.2008 | ||
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
IE | 01.10.2008 | ||
RO | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
SK | 01.10.2008 | ||
BE | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | DK | 01.10.2008 | |
EE | 01.10.2008 | ||
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
IE | 01.10.2008 | ||
RO | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | DK | 01.10.2008 | |
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
IE | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/25] | FI | 01.10.2008 | |
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/23] | SI | 01.10.2008 | |
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/16] | SI | 01.10.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3641023 (MAINZ GMBH FEINMECH WERKE [DE]) [A] 1-5,7,12-14* column 2, line 18 - column 4, line 64; figures 1,3 *; | [X]US5665919 (WOYSKI WILLIAM B [US], et al) [X] 1-5,14-16 * column 6, lines 10-13 * * column 10, line 28 - column 11, line 16; figure 5 *; | [X]DE19632368 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-4,14,16 * column 2, lines 18-27 * * column 3, lines 1-35 * * column 4, lines 23-68; figure . *; | [X]US5730174 (MISMAS JAMES R [US]) [X] 1-6,8,9,14,16 * column 4, line 63 - column 5, line 34; figure 4 * |