EP1410718 - Elastomer processing system for chewing gum [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.01.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intercontinental Great Brands LLC 100 Deforest Avenue East Hanover, NJ 07936 / US | [2013/50] |
Former [2012/04] | For all designated states Kraft Foods Global Brands LLC Three Lakes Drive Northfield, IL 60093 / US | ||
Former [2004/17] | For all designated states Cadbury Adams USA LLC 2711 Centerville Road, Suite 400 Wilmington, DE 19808 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Degrady, Marc 91 Patriots Road Morris Plains NJ 07950 / US | 02 /
Duggan, James A. 514 Otto Road Machesney Park IL 61115 / US | 03 /
Tebrinke, Kevin Richard 5 Ridgewood Drive Fort Madison IA 52627 / US | 04 /
Bunkers, Joseph 13819 Cassadale Caledonia IL 61072 / US | 05 /
Upmann, Arthur W. 13819 Cassidy Rockton IL 61072 / US | [2004/17] | Representative(s) | Wilson Gunn Charles House 148/9 Great Charles Street Birmingham B3 3HT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/11] | Wilson Gunn Charles House 148/9 Great Charles Street Birmingham B3 3HT / GB | ||
Former [2010/34] | Wilson Gunn Charles House 148/9 Great Charles Street Birmingham B3 3HT / GB | ||
Former [2004/17] | Wilson Gunn Skerrett Charles House 148/9 Great Charles Street Birmingham B3 3HT / GB | Application number, filing date | 03024695.3 | 22.07.1998 | [2004/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1410718 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1410718 | Date: | 13.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A23G4/02 | [2012/42] | CPC: |
A23G4/02 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2004/17] | A23G3/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2004/17] | Extension states | AL | 28.10.2003 | LT | 28.10.2003 | LV | 28.10.2003 | MK | 28.10.2003 | RO | 28.10.2003 | SI | 28.10.2003 | Title | German: | Elastomes Behandlungssystem zur Herstellung von Kaugummi | [2004/17] | English: | Elastomer processing system for chewing gum | [2004/17] | French: | Système de traitement d'élastomère pour chewing gum | [2004/17] | Examination procedure | 28.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/17] | 18.03.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98935869.2 / EP1098571 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19980935869) is 21.03.2003 | Opposition(s) | 16.12.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.10.2003 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   02.04.2004 | 31.07.2004 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   27.08.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.03.2013 | BE | 13.03.2013 | CY | 13.03.2013 | DK | 13.03.2013 | FI | 13.03.2013 | IT | 13.03.2013 | MC | 13.03.2013 | NL | 13.03.2013 | SE | 13.03.2013 | GR | 14.06.2013 | PT | 15.07.2013 | IE | 22.07.2013 | LU | 22.07.2013 | CH | 31.07.2013 | LI | 31.07.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2014/33] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CY | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
IT | 13.03.2013 | ||
MC | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
IE | 22.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CY | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
IT | 13.03.2013 | ||
MC | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CY | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
IT | 13.03.2013 | ||
MC | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CY | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
IT | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CY | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CY | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | BE | 13.03.2013 | |
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/44] | BE | 13.03.2013 | |
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | FI | 13.03.2013 | |
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | SE | 13.03.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]SU965513 ; | [X]GB2073048 (AIRCO INC) [X] 1-6 * page 2, line 64 - line 87; figure - *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1983, no. 33, Database accession no. 1983-739898, XP002104340 & SU965513 A 19821015 (RUBBER TECH EQUIP INST) [A] 3 * abstract * | by applicant | GB2073048 | US4555407 | US5045325 | US5135760 | US5419919 | US5486366 |