EP1433522 - Power bowl lift, motor mount and tensioner for mixing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.04.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Premark FEG L.L.C. 1300 Market Street, Suite 504 Wilmington Delaware 19801 / US | [2006/22] |
Former [2004/27] | For all designated states Premark FEG L.L.C. 1300 Market Street, Suite 504 Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Donthnier, Thomas S. 715 Spartan Avenue Vandalia Ohio 45377 / US | 02 /
Valentine, Richard Dwight 9191 U.S. Route 62 Hillsboro Ohio 45133 / US | 03 /
Schnipke, Janice J. 5385 N. Hampton Road Springfield Ohio 45520 / US | 04 /
Brunswick, Brian A. 1331 Stonycreek Road Troy Ohio 45373 / US | 05 /
Bader, Brian E. 25 East Home Road Springfield Ohio 45504 / US | [2004/27] | Representative(s) | Vetter, Ewald Otto, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Vetter, Ewald Otto, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Anwaltssozietät Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | ||
Former [2004/27] | Vetter, Ewald Otto, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Anwaltssozietät GbR (Depotstrasse 5 1/2, 86199 Augsburg), Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 03024928.8 | 29.10.2003 | [2004/27] | Priority number, date | US20020329257 | 23.12.2002 Original published format: US 329257 | [2004/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1433522 | Date: | 30.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1433522 | Date: | 08.09.2004 | [2004/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1433522 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B01F7/16, A47J43/044, B65G23/44 | [2004/35] | CPC: |
B01F27/806 (EP,US);
A47J2043/04463 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/27] | B01F7/16, A47J43/044 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/21] |
Former [2004/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Energiebetriebene Schüsselhubvorrichtung, Motorhalterung und Spannvorrichtung für Mischmaschine | [2006/21] | English: | Power bowl lift, motor mount and tensioner for mixing machine | [2004/27] | French: | Dispositif d'élévation électrique de bol, fixation de moteur et tendeur de courroie pour une machine à mélanger | [2006/21] |
Former [2004/27] | Kesselhalterbetrieb, Motorlager und Zugmittelspanneinrichtung für Mischmaschine | ||
Former [2004/27] | Dispositif d'elevation electrique du godet, fixation de moteur et tendeur de courroie pour une machine à mélanger | Examination procedure | 19.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/11] | 14.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB861915 (KENWOOD MFG COMPANY LTD) [Y] 1-8,10-12 * page 1, line 56 - page 2, line 4; figure . *; | [Y]DE4012776 (FRANKFURTER OFEN-MASCHINENBAU K. OCHS) [Y] 1-8,10-12 * column 2, line 25 - column 3, line 36; figure - *; | [A]EP0655215 (BLODGETT G S CORP [US]) [A] 14,15,17,19 * abstract * * column 5, lines 45-52 *; | [X]US5472276 (RATERMANN PHILIP A [US], et al) [X] 1-3,10-13 * column 3, line 6 - column 5, line 10 * * column 3, lines 50-55; figures 1,2,4 *; | [X]DE19754646 (PORSCHE DESIGN GMBH [AT]) [X] 1,11-13 * column 2, line 17 - column 3, line 1; figure -; claim 6 *; | [A]DE19926045 (RUBERG MISCHTECHNIK KG [DE]) [A] 1-3 * column 2, line 16 - column 4, line 20; figure 1 *; | [A]FR2805177 (VMI [FR]) [A] 13* page 6, line 21 - page 13, line 31; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2002075751 (GHANIZADEH KHOUB MOHAMMAD HASH [DE]) [A] 1 * page 1, paragraphs 9-14; figure - * |