blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1418798

EP1418798 - Printed circuit board and method for installing printed circuit board onto electro-conductive housing [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.04.2008
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip18.04.2008No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.05.2008  [2008/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KONICA MINOLTA HOLDINGS, INC.
6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0005 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2004/20]For all designated states
KONICA MINOLTA HOLDINGS, INC.
6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0005 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kishimoto, Tadao
Konica Minolta Bus. Tech. Inc. 2970 Ishikawa-machi
Hachioji-shi Tokyo, 192-8505 / JP
02 / Igarashi, Yutaka
Konica Minolta Bus. Tech. Inc. 2970 Ishikawa-machi
Hachioji-shi Tokyo, 192-8505 / JP
03 / Hirayama, Hironobu
Konica Minolta Bus. Tech. Inc. 2970 Ishikawa-machi
Hachioji-shi Tokyo, 192-8505 / JP
 [2004/20]
Representative(s)Henkel & Partner mbB
Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Maximiliansplatz 21
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/20]Henkel, Feiler & Hänzel
Möhlstrasse 37
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date03024969.229.10.2003
[2004/20]
Priority number, dateJP2002032232706.11.2002         Original published format: JP 2002322327
[2004/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1418798
Date:12.05.2004
Language:EN
[2004/20]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1418798
Date:29.06.2005
[2005/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1418798
Date:13.06.2007
Language:EN
[2007/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.05.2005
ClassificationIPC:H05K7/04
[2004/20]
CPC:
H05K1/0234 (EP,US); H05K1/0215 (EP,US); H05K1/0218 (EP,US);
H05K7/142 (EP,US); H05K9/0039 (EP,US); H05K1/0231 (EP,US);
H05K1/116 (EP,US); H05K2201/09354 (EP,US); H05K2201/09618 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10022 (EP,US); H05K2201/10409 (EP,US); H05K2201/10446 (EP,US);
H05K3/325 (EP,US); H05K3/429 (EP,US); Y10T29/49155 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2006/12]
Former [2004/20]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Leiterplatte und Methode um eine Leiterplatte an einem elektrisch leitenden Gehäuse anzubringen[2004/20]
English:Printed circuit board and method for installing printed circuit board onto electro-conductive housing[2004/20]
French:Circuit imprimé et méthode pour installer un circuit imprimé dans un boîtier electriquement conducteur[2004/20]
Examination procedure29.12.2005Examination requested  [2006/09]
02.05.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.09.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.11.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.03.2007Fee for grant paid
26.03.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.03.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
12.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0429037  (ALCATEL RADIOTELEPHONE [FR]) [Y] 1,3-6,8,10,11 * column 2, line 28 - line 53; figures 2,3 *;
 [A]US5355105  (ANGELUCCI SR THOMAS L [US]) [A] 1-12* column 3, line 62 - column 6, line 46; figure 3 *;
 [Y]US5376759  (MARX DIETER O [CA], et al) [Y] 1,3-6,8,10,11 * column 7, line 39 - column 8, line 62; figures 3,4 *;
 [A]US5500789  (MILLER KEVIN L [US], et al) [A] 9 * column 4, line 57 - column 5, line 42; figure 6 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.