Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Event history: EP1530034


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
14.07.2006 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  16.08.2006  [2006/33]
17.03.2006 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
29.12.2005 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
16.12.2005 Definitive list of designations published on  01.02.2006  [2006/05]
14.12.2005 New entry: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC1973: despatch of communication + time limit
14.12.2005 New entry: Period of grace R.85b EPC 1973: despatch of communication + time limit
25.03.2005 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  11.05.2005  [2005/19]