blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1530034

EP1530034 - An infrared thermometer and a method for determining a temperature [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.07.2006
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip14.07.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.08.2006  [2006/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microlife Intellectual Property GmbH
Max Schmidheiny-Strasse 201
9435 Heerbrugg / CH
[2005/19]
Inventor(s)01 / Yu-Chiao, Chi
No.40, Lane 568 Wen Hua Street
Yang Mei town Tao Yuan county / TW
 [2005/19]
Representative(s)Müller, Christoph Emanuel, et al
Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG Friedtalweg 5
9500 Wil / CH
[N/P]
Former [2005/19]Müller, Christoph Emanuel, et al
Hepp, Wenger & Ryffel AG, Friedtalweg 5
9500 Wil / CH
Application number, filing date03025221.705.11.2003
[2005/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1530034
Date:11.05.2005
Language:EN
[2005/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.05.2004
ClassificationIPC:G01K13/00, G01K1/20
[2005/19]
CPC:
G01J5/0022 (EP,US); G01J5/0025 (EP,US); G01J5/02 (EP,US);
G01J5/025 (EP,US); G01J5/026 (EP,US); G01J5/064 (EP,US);
G01K1/20 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2006/05]
Former [2005/19]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Infrarot-Thermometer und ein Verfahren zum Berechnen einer Temperatur[2005/19]
English:An infrared thermometer and a method for determining a temperature[2005/19]
French:Thermomètre infrarouge et un procédé pour la déterminer la température[2005/19]
Examination procedure12.11.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/33]
23.03.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2006/33]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
20.12.2005AT   M01   Not yet paid
20.12.2005BE   M01   Not yet paid
20.12.2005BG   M01   Not yet paid
20.12.2005CH   M01   Not yet paid
20.12.2005CY   M01   Not yet paid
20.12.2005CZ   M01   Not yet paid
20.12.2005DE   M01   Not yet paid
20.12.2005DK   M01   Not yet paid
20.12.2005EE   M01   Not yet paid
20.12.2005ES   M01   Not yet paid
20.12.2005FI   M01   Not yet paid
20.12.2005FR   M01   Not yet paid
20.12.2005GB   M01   Not yet paid
20.12.2005GR   M01   Not yet paid
20.12.2005HU   M01   Not yet paid
20.12.2005IE   M01   Not yet paid
20.12.2005IT   M01   Not yet paid
20.12.2005LU   M01   Not yet paid
20.12.2005MC   M01   Not yet paid
20.12.2005NL   M01   Not yet paid
20.12.2005PT   M01   Not yet paid
20.12.2005RO   M01   Not yet paid
20.12.2005SE   M01   Not yet paid
20.12.2005SI   M01   Not yet paid
20.12.2005SK   M01   Not yet paid
20.12.2005TR   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
20.12.2005M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200503   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]US4993419  (POMPEI FRANCESCO [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,9 * column 13, line 27 - column 13, line 41; figure 8B *;
 [A]EP0786649  (THERMOSCAN INC [US]) [A] 1-9 * column W *;
 [Y]US6056435  (POMPEI FRANCESCO [US]) [Y] 1-3,9 * figures 1,2; claim 1 *;
 [A]US2002191670  (HUANG YU CHIEN [TW], et al) [A] 1-9* column W *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.