EP1424282 - Control of temperature of supply of pressurised air [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2007 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell Normalair-Garrett (Holdings) Limited Yeovil Somerset BA20 2YD / GB | [2006/25] |
Former [2004/23] | For all designated states Honeywell Normalair-Garrett (Holdings) Limited Yeovil, Somerset BA20 2YD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zaple, Michael John 11 Rye Gardens Yeovil Somerset BA20 2TF / GB | 02 /
White, Christopher James 21 Long Mead Yeovil Somerset BA21 3RH / GB | [2004/23] | Representative(s) | Lucking, David John, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Lucking, David John, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/23] | Lucking, David John, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03025402.3 | 05.11.2003 | [2004/23] | Priority number, date | GB20020028003 | 30.11.2002 Original published format: GB 0228003 | [2004/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1424282 | Date: | 02.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1424282 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B64D13/06 | [2004/23] | CPC: |
B64D13/06 (EP,US);
B64D13/04 (EP,US);
B64D13/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/23] | Title | German: | Temperaturregelung von Druckluftzufuhr | [2004/23] | English: | Control of temperature of supply of pressurised air | [2004/23] | French: | Réglage de température d'alimentation d'air comprimé | [2004/23] | Examination procedure | 26.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/52] | 13.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.06.2006 | BE | 21.06.2006 | CH | 21.06.2006 | CY | 21.06.2006 | CZ | 21.06.2006 | EE | 21.06.2006 | FI | 21.06.2006 | LI | 21.06.2006 | NL | 21.06.2006 | RO | 21.06.2006 | SI | 21.06.2006 | SK | 21.06.2006 | TR | 21.06.2006 | BG | 21.09.2006 | DK | 21.09.2006 | SE | 21.09.2006 | GR | 22.09.2006 | LU | 05.11.2006 | IE | 06.11.2006 | PT | 21.11.2006 | MC | 30.11.2006 | HU | 22.12.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
EE | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
RO | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
TR | 21.06.2006 | ||
BG | 21.09.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
LU | 05.11.2006 | ||
IE | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
HU | 22.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/32] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
EE | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
RO | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
BG | 21.09.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
IE | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
HU | 22.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/31] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
EE | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
RO | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
BG | 21.09.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
IE | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
EE | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
RO | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
IE | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
RO | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
IE | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
RO | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
IE | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/49] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
IT | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
RO | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
IE | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/41] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
IT | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
RO | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/40] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
IT | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 21.09.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2870698 (BEST STANLEY G) [X] 1-8 * column 1, line 68 - column 2, line 29 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US4312191 (BIAGINI GUIDO) [A] 1-8 * column 5, lines 53-68 * * column 9, line 46 - column 10, line 34 * * figures 3,3A *; | [A]US4840036 (SPRAKER JR WILBUR A [US]) [A] 1-8* figure 1 * |