EP1418690 - Optical amplifying apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 03.10.2007 [2007/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/17] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | ||
Former [2004/20] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ogiwara, Hiroshi Fujitsu Ltd. 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
Ohta, Kenji Fujitsu Ltd. 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2004/20] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/20] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03025420.5 | 05.11.2003 | [2004/20] | Priority number, date | JP20020321075 | 05.11.2002 Original published format: JP 2002321075 | [2004/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1418690 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1418690 | Date: | 16.06.2004 | [2004/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1418690 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/17 | [2004/20] | CPC: |
H04B10/2916 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/10] |
Former [2004/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Optischer Verstärker | [2004/20] | English: | Optical amplifying apparatus | [2004/20] | French: | Dispositif d'amplification optique | [2004/20] | Examination procedure | 27.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/39] | 20.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 27.07.2006 | [2007/40] | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO9842088 (SDL INC [US]) [X] 1 * abstract * * figure 1 * * page 8, lines 6-10,22,23 * * page 9, lines 5-27 * * page 10, lines 13-15 * [A] 2-8; | [A]EP0911926 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0058] - [0060] * * paragraphs [0077] , [0078] * * figures 29,33 *; | [YA]EP0963065 (KDD CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 8 * abstract * * figure 1 * * column 4, lines 4-6 * * paragraph [0023] * * column 4, lines 35-37 * [A] 1-7; | [XAY]EP1054489 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [X] 1,3,5 * paragraphs [0014] - [0016] * * figures 1,2 * [A] 2,4,6,7 [Y] 8; | [A]EP1233484 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [A] 1-8* claims 1-7,9 * |