EP1418661 - DC-DC Converter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.10.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.11.2014 [2014/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. 10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617-8555 / JP | [2007/37] |
Former [2004/20] | For all designated states Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsumoto, Tadahiko, (A170)Intell. Prop. Dep. Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd 26-10-2, Tenjin Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP | [2004/20] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/50] | Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann Stöckeler & Zinkler & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | ||
Former [2009/29] | Schoppe, Fritz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | ||
Former [2004/20] | Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler, Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03025623.4 | 06.11.2003 | [2004/20] | Priority number, date | JP20020323489 | 07.11.2002 Original published format: JP 2002323489 | JP20030304922 | 28.08.2003 Original published format: JP 2003304922 | [2004/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1418661 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1418661 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | [2009/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/335 | [2009/07] | CPC: |
H02M3/335 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/20] | H02M3/28 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/20] | Title | German: | Gleichstrom/Gleichstrom-Wandler | [2004/20] | English: | DC-DC Converter | [2004/20] | French: | Convertisseur CC-CC | [2004/20] | Examination procedure | 06.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/20] | 31.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/45] | 27.06.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.04.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2013 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4870555 (WHITE ALAN V [US]) [X] 1-3,6-15,17,18 * column A * * figure 1 * * column 4, line 44 - line 61 * [Y] 4,16; | [Y]EP0396125 (SEL ALCATEL AG [DE], et al) [Y] 4,16 * column A * * column 3, line 34 - line 51 *; | [DA]EP1037368 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]) [DA] 1 * column A * * paragraphs [0011] - [0016]; figures 1,6,7,9 *; | [A]US6198638 (LEE SANG YUN [KR]) [A] 1 * column A * * figures 5,6 * * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 19 * * column 5, line 36 - column 6, line 27 *; | [A]WO0167588 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1 * column A * * page 4, line 12 - line 14 * * page 6, line 1 - line 7 *; | [A]US6396250 (BRIDGE CHRISTOPHER DAVID [US]) [A] 1 * column A * * figure 7 ** column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 24 * | by applicant | US4870555 | JPH02247848 | JPH02247849 | EP0396125 | JPH04127869 | JPH10174431 | JPH11206118 |