Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
12.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] |
17.02.2009 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
04.12.2008 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
04.09.2008 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
01.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] |
06.12.2007 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
17.05.2007 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
27.03.2007 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
01.12.2006 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
01.12.2006 | Definitive list of designations | published on 03.01.2007 [2007/01] |
10.11.2006 | First examination report | |
07.11.2006 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
16.06.2006 | Request for examination filed | published on 19.07.2006 [2006/29] |
10.03.2006 | Publication of search report | published on 26.04.2006 [2006/17] |
01.12.2005 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
04.06.2004 | Change - applicant | published on 21.07.2004 [2004/30] |
07.05.2004 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 23.06.2004 [2004/26] |