EP1426962 - Recording apparatus and recording method with data recovery means [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.11.2008 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.12.2008 [2008/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2004/24] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iwasaki, Shiro 444-1-303 Oaza Ikawa Iizuka-shi Fukuoka 820-0054 / JP | 02 /
Gotoh, Yoshiho 5-1-3 Higashinakahama Joto-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 536-0023 / JP | [2004/24] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/24] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 03026116.8 | 13.11.2003 | [2004/24] | Priority number, date | JP20020331899 | 15.11.2002 Original published format: JP 2002331899 | [2004/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1426962 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/24] | Classification | IPC: | G11B27/36, G11B19/04, G11B20/18 | [2004/24] | CPC: |
G11B27/3027 (EP,US);
G11B20/10 (KR);
G11B19/04 (EP,US);
G11B20/18 (EP,US);
G11B20/1866 (EP,US);
G11B27/034 (EP,US);
G11B27/329 (EP,US);
G11B27/36 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2541 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2562 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Aufzeichnungsgerät und Aufzeichnungsverfahren mit Datenrückgewinnungsvorrichtung | [2004/24] | English: | Recording apparatus and recording method with data recovery means | [2004/24] | French: | Appareil d'enregistrement et méthode d'enregistrement avec dispositif de récupération de données | [2004/24] | Examination procedure | 11.11.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |