EP1420491 - Optical amplifier and optical amplifier control method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.04.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.05.2007 [2007/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/21] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iizuka, Hiroshi, Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
Komaki, Kosuke, Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 03 /
Itou, Hiroyuki, Fujitsu Network Technologies Ltd. 9-18, Shinyokohama 3-chome Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 222-0033 / JP | [2004/21] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/21] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03026173.9 | 17.11.2003 | [2004/21] | Priority number, date | JP20020333501 | 18.11.2002 Original published format: JP 2002333501 | [2004/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1420491 | Date: | 19.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1420491 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | [2005/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/067 | [2004/21] | CPC: |
H04B10/2942 (EP,US);
H01S3/06758 (EP,US);
H01S3/13013 (EP,US);
H01S3/0078 (EP,US);
H01S3/0912 (EP,US);
H01S3/10015 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/03] |
Former [2004/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Optischer Verstärker und Verfahren zu dessen Regelung | [2004/21] | English: | Optical amplifier and optical amplifier control method | [2004/21] | French: | Amplificateur optique et procédé de réglage d'un amplificateur optique | [2004/21] | Examination procedure | 31.05.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/34] | 23.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/22] | 09.01.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2007/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2006 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0944190 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4,13,18,23-28 * figures 9,13,15 *; | [A]US2002067538 (SUGAYA YASUSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-32 * figure 10 *; | [E]EP1376904 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [E] 1-4,13,18,23-28 * the whole document *; | [A] - PARK S Y ET AL, "A gain-flattened two-stage EDFA for WDM optical networks with a fast link control channel", OPTICS COMMUNICATIONS, NORTH-HOLLAND PUBLISHING CO. AMSTERDAM, NL, (19980715), vol. 153, no. 1-3, ISSN 0030-4018, pages 23 - 26, XP004146322 [A] 1-32 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0030-4018(98)00225-9 |