Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
19.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.06.2006 [2006/25] |
27.05.2005 | (Expected) grant | published on 13.07.2005 [2005/28] |
23.05.2005 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
23.05.2005 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
04.01.2005 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
10.12.2004 | Definitive list of designations | published on 26.01.2005 [2005/04] |
10.09.2004 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
10.07.2004 | Amendment by applicant | |
19.03.2004 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 06.05.2004 [2004/19] |
19.03.2004 | Request for examination filed | published on 06.05.2004 [2004/19] |
27.11.2003 | New entry: Renewal fee paid |