Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0997746 | Global Dossier | 20.04.2005 | B1 | EP0997746 | 30.05.2001 | A4 | EP0997746 | 03.05.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP4390898 | 25.02.1998 | JP9804670 | 15.10.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1416292 | Global Dossier | 13.07.2005 | B1 | EP1416292 | 06.05.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP4390898 | 25.02.1998 | EP98947893 | 15.10.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69829851T | 12.01.2006 | T2 | DE69829851D1 | 25.05.2005 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP4390898 | 25.02.1998 | JP9804670 | 15.10.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6335789 | 01.01.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP4390898 | 25.02.1998 | JP9804670 | 15.10.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9944074 | Global Dossier | 02.09.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP4390898 | 25.02.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH11242518 | Global Dossier | 07.09.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | JP4390898 | 25.02.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69830861T | 29.12.2005 | T2 | DE69830861D1 | 18.08.2005 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP4390898 | 25.02.1998 | Type | Earlier application | EP0997746 |