EP1434349 - Circuit for protecting a transistor against overvoltage and overcurrent [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.2005 Database last updated on 26.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEMIKRON Elektronik GmbH & Co. KG Sigmundstrasse 200 90431 Nürnberg / DE | [2005/34] |
Former [2004/27] | For all designated states Semikron Elektronik GmbH Sigmundstrasse 200 90431 Nürnberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nascimento, Jair do Am tiefen Weg 24 91077 Dormitz / DE | 02 /
Mühlhöfer, Alexander Leopoldstrasse 65 90439 Nürnberg / DE | [2004/44] |
Former [2004/27] | 01 /
Nascimento, Jair do Am tiefen Weg 24 91077 Dormitz / DE | ||
02 /
Mühlhöfer, Alexander Leopoldstrasse 65 90439 NürnberG / DE | Application number, filing date | 03027135.7 | 26.11.2003 | [2004/27] | Priority number, date | DE2002156057 | 30.11.2002 Original published format: DE 10256057 | [2004/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1434349 | Date: | 30.06.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1434349 | Date: | 26.01.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H03K17/082 | [2004/27] | CPC: |
H03K17/0826 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/27] | Title | German: | Schaltungsordnung zum Schutz eines Transistors gegen Überstrom und Überspannung | [2004/27] | English: | Circuit for protecting a transistor against overvoltage and overcurrent | [2004/27] | French: | Circuit de protection d'un transistor contre la surtension et la surintensité de courant | [2004/27] | Examination procedure | 15.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/27] | 24.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/03] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 26.01.2005 | CZ | 26.01.2005 | EE | 26.01.2005 | FI | 26.01.2005 | FR | 26.01.2005 | GB | 26.01.2005 | IE | 26.01.2005 | IT | 26.01.2005 | NL | 26.01.2005 | RO | 26.01.2005 | SI | 26.01.2005 | SK | 26.01.2005 | TR | 26.01.2005 | DK | 26.04.2005 | GR | 26.04.2005 | SE | 26.04.2005 | HU | 27.04.2005 | ES | 07.05.2005 | PT | 26.06.2005 | [2008/04] |
Former [2007/42] | BG | 26.01.2005 | |
CZ | 26.01.2005 | ||
EE | 26.01.2005 | ||
FI | 26.01.2005 | ||
FR | 26.01.2005 | ||
GB | 26.01.2005 | ||
IE | 26.01.2005 | ||
IT | 26.01.2005 | ||
NL | 26.01.2005 | ||
RO | 26.01.2005 | ||
SI | 26.01.2005 | ||
SK | 26.01.2005 | ||
TR | 26.01.2005 | ||
DK | 26.04.2005 | ||
GR | 26.04.2005 | ||
SE | 26.04.2005 | ||
HU | 27.04.2005 | ||
ES | 07.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/40] | BG | 26.01.2005 | |
CZ | 26.01.2005 | ||
EE | 26.01.2005 | ||
FI | 26.01.2005 | ||
FR | 26.01.2005 | ||
GB | 26.01.2005 | ||
IE | 26.01.2005 | ||
IT | 26.01.2005 | ||
NL | 26.01.2005 | ||
SI | 26.01.2005 | ||
SK | 26.01.2005 | ||
TR | 26.01.2005 | ||
DK | 26.04.2005 | ||
GR | 26.04.2005 | ||
SE | 26.04.2005 | ||
HU | 27.04.2005 | ||
ES | 07.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/14] | BG | 26.01.2005 | |
CZ | 26.01.2005 | ||
EE | 26.01.2005 | ||
FI | 26.01.2005 | ||
FR | 26.01.2005 | ||
GB | 26.01.2005 | ||
IE | 26.01.2005 | ||
NL | 26.01.2005 | ||
SI | 26.01.2005 | ||
SK | 26.01.2005 | ||
TR | 26.01.2005 | ||
DK | 26.04.2005 | ||
GR | 26.04.2005 | ||
SE | 26.04.2005 | ||
HU | 27.04.2005 | ||
ES | 07.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/13] | BG | 26.01.2005 | |
CZ | 26.01.2005 | ||
EE | 26.01.2005 | ||
FI | 26.01.2005 | ||
FR | 26.01.2005 | ||
GB | 26.01.2005 | ||
IE | 26.01.2005 | ||
NL | 26.01.2005 | ||
SI | 26.01.2005 | ||
SK | 26.01.2005 | ||
TR | 26.01.2005 | ||
DK | 26.04.2005 | ||
GR | 26.04.2005 | ||
SE | 26.04.2005 | ||
ES | 07.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | BG | 26.01.2005 | |
CZ | 26.01.2005 | ||
FI | 26.01.2005 | ||
FR | 26.01.2005 | ||
GB | 26.01.2005 | ||
IE | 26.01.2005 | ||
NL | 26.01.2005 | ||
SI | 26.01.2005 | ||
SK | 26.01.2005 | ||
TR | 26.01.2005 | ||
DK | 26.04.2005 | ||
GR | 26.04.2005 | ||
SE | 26.04.2005 | ||
ES | 07.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/31] | BG | 26.01.2005 | |
CZ | 26.01.2005 | ||
FI | 26.01.2005 | ||
FR | 26.01.2005 | ||
GB | 26.01.2005 | ||
IE | 26.01.2005 | ||
NL | 26.01.2005 | ||
SI | 26.01.2005 | ||
SK | 26.01.2005 | ||
DK | 26.04.2005 | ||
GR | 26.04.2005 | ||
SE | 26.04.2005 | ||
ES | 07.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | BG | 26.01.2005 | |
CZ | 26.01.2005 | ||
FI | 26.01.2005 | ||
GB | 26.01.2005 | ||
IE | 26.01.2005 | ||
NL | 26.01.2005 | ||
SI | 26.01.2005 | ||
SK | 26.01.2005 | ||
DK | 26.04.2005 | ||
GR | 26.04.2005 | ||
SE | 26.04.2005 | ||
ES | 07.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/15] | BG | 26.01.2005 | |
CZ | 26.01.2005 | ||
FI | 26.01.2005 | ||
GB | 26.01.2005 | ||
IE | 26.01.2005 | ||
SI | 26.01.2005 | ||
SK | 26.01.2005 | ||
DK | 26.04.2005 | ||
GR | 26.04.2005 | ||
SE | 26.04.2005 | ||
ES | 07.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | BG | 26.01.2005 | |
FI | 26.01.2005 | ||
GB | 26.01.2005 | ||
IE | 26.01.2005 | ||
SI | 26.01.2005 | ||
SK | 26.01.2005 | ||
DK | 26.04.2005 | ||
GR | 26.04.2005 | ||
SE | 26.04.2005 | ||
ES | 07.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | BG | 26.01.2005 | |
FI | 26.01.2005 | ||
GB | 26.01.2005 | ||
IE | 26.01.2005 | ||
SI | 26.01.2005 | ||
SK | 26.01.2005 | ||
DK | 26.04.2005 | ||
SE | 26.04.2005 | ||
ES | 07.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | BG | 26.01.2005 | |
FI | 26.01.2005 | ||
GB | 26.01.2005 | ||
SI | 26.01.2005 | ||
SK | 26.01.2005 | ||
DK | 26.04.2005 | ||
SE | 26.04.2005 | ||
ES | 07.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/01] | BG | 26.01.2005 | |
FI | 26.01.2005 | ||
SI | 26.01.2005 | ||
SK | 26.01.2005 | ||
SE | 26.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | BG | 26.01.2005 | |
FI | 26.01.2005 | ||
SI | 26.01.2005 | ||
SE | 26.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/48] | BG | 26.01.2005 | |
FI | 26.01.2005 | ||
SE | 26.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | BG | 26.01.2005 | |
FI | 26.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/30] | BG | 26.01.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3121754 (SIEMENS AG) [A] 1* column 2, line 28 - column 4, line 7; figure 1 *; | [A]DE3238899 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * page 5, paragraph 1 - page 9, paragraph 1; figure 1 *; | [A]US4503480 (PICKARD RONALD D [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 5, line 15 - column 7, line 7; figure 2 *; | [A]US4849683 (FLOLID GREGORY W [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |