EP1426566 - Electromagnetically driven valve control apparatus and electromagnetically driven valve control method for internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.12.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.02.2006 [2006/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/07] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | ||
Former [2004/24] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hayase, Yuichiro c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
Tsubone, Kenji c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 03 /
Yanai, Akihiro c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 04 /
Kadowaki, Yoshinori c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 05 /
Fuwa, Toshio c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2004/24] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/24] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03027199.3 | 27.11.2003 | [2004/24] | Priority number, date | JP20020346229 | 28.11.2002 Original published format: JP 2002346229 | [2004/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1426566 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1426566 | Date: | 16.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F01L9/04, F02D13/02, F02D41/20 | [2004/24] | CPC: |
F02D13/0253 (EP,US);
F01L1/267 (EP,US);
F01L9/20 (EP,US);
F02D41/20 (EP,US);
F02F1/4214 (EP,US);
F01L2009/2136 (EP,US);
F01L2800/00 (EP,US);
F02D2041/001 (EP,US);
F02D41/266 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/07] |
Former [2004/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektromagnetisch angetriebene Ventilbetätigungsvorrichtung und Kontrollmetode für elektromagnetisch angetriebene Ventilbetätigungsvorrichtung einer Brennkraftmaschine | [2004/24] | English: | Electromagnetically driven valve control apparatus and electromagnetically driven valve control method for internal combustion engine | [2004/24] | French: | Appareil électromagnétique de contrôle de soupapes et méthode pour contrôler un appareil électromagnétique de contrôle de soupapes d'un moteur à combustion interne | [2004/24] | Examination procedure | 27.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/24] | 11.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/06] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP2001221022 ; | [AD]JP2000234534 ; | [AD]JPH09189209 ; | [A]US6202608 (YAMAKI TOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [A]EP1104844 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002011101 (HARTKE ANDREAS [DE], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010412), vol. 2000, no. 25, & JP2001221022 A 20010817 (NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) [AD] 1-11 * abstract * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010103), vol. 2000, no. 11, & JP2000234534 A 20000829 (NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) [AD] 1-11 * abstract * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971128), vol. 1997, no. 11, & JP09189209 A 19970722 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [AD] 1-11 * abstract * |