EP1457394 - Motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.07.2007 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Benteler Automobiltechnik GmbH Residenzstrasse 1 33104 Paderborn / DE | [2004/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Holtschulte, Katja Kirchstr. 3 33161 Hövelhof / DE | 02 /
Nolze, Hans-Patrick Auf dem Busche 65 33129 Delbrück / DE | 03 /
Antes, Dirk Völklinger Str. 1 66265 Heusweiler / DE | 04 /
Korinth, Hendrick Von-Ketteler-Str. 6 33106 Paderborn / DE | 05 /
Fischer, Jochem Montluelweg 5 73760 Ostfildern / DE | 06 /
Hilgenberg, Stefan Dr. Rörig Damm 34 33102 Paderborn / DE | 07 /
Juarez-Perez, Ricardo Heierswall 2 33098 Paderborn / DE | 08 /
Hoffmann, Jörg Leitzweilerstr. 13 66636 Theley / DE | 09 /
Rüther, Harald Sachsewelke 26 59939 Olsberg / DE | [2006/38] |
Former [2004/38] | 01 /
Holtschulte, Katja Kirchstr. 3 33161 Hövelhof / DE | ||
02 /
Nolze, Hans-Patrick Auf dem Busche 65 33129 Delbrück / DE | |||
03 /
Antes, Dirk Völklinger Str. 1 66265 Heusweiler / DE | |||
04 /
Korinth, Hendrick Von-Ketteler-Str. 6 33106 Paderborn / DE | |||
05 /
Fischer, Jochem Montluelweg 5 73760 Ostfildern / DE | |||
06 /
Hilgenberg, Stefan Dr. Rörig Damm 34 33102 Paderborn / DE | |||
07 /
Juarez-Perez, Ricardo Heierwall 2 33098 Paderborn / DE | |||
08 /
Hoffmann, Jörg Leitzweilerstr. 13 66636 Theley / DE | |||
09 /
Rüther, Harald Sachsewelke 26 59939 Olsberg / DE | Representative(s) | Griepenstroh, Jörg Bockermann Ksoll Griepenstroh Osterhoff Patentanwälte Bergstrasse 159 44791 Bochum / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/38] | Griepenstroh, Jörg Patentanwälte Bockermann, Ksoll Griepenstroh, Bergstrasse 159 44791 Bochum / DE | Application number, filing date | 03027217.3 | 28.11.2003 | [2004/38] | Priority number, date | DE2003111220 | 14.03.2003 Original published format: DE 10311220 | [2004/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1457394 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/38] | Type: | A9 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP1457394 | Date: | 09.02.2005 | [2005/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1457394 | Date: | 07.12.2005 | [2005/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1457394 | Date: | 20.09.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/34, B62D25/12 | [2005/49] | CPC: |
B60R21/34 (EP);
B60R2021/343 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2004/38] | B60R21/34 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/38] | Title | German: | Personenkraftwagen | [2004/38] | English: | Motor vehicle | [2004/38] | French: | Véhicule automobile | [2004/38] | Examination procedure | 09.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/06] | 24.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 20.09.2006 | CZ | 20.09.2006 | EE | 20.09.2006 | FI | 20.09.2006 | GB | 20.09.2006 | IE | 20.09.2006 | IT | 20.09.2006 | NL | 20.09.2006 | RO | 20.09.2006 | SI | 20.09.2006 | SK | 20.09.2006 | TR | 20.09.2006 | AT | 28.11.2006 | LU | 28.11.2006 | BE | 30.11.2006 | MC | 30.11.2006 | BG | 20.12.2006 | DK | 20.12.2006 | SE | 20.12.2006 | GR | 21.12.2006 | ES | 31.12.2006 | PT | 12.03.2007 | HU | 21.03.2007 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | CZ | 20.09.2006 | |
EE | 20.09.2006 | ||
FI | 20.09.2006 | ||
GB | 20.09.2006 | ||
IE | 20.09.2006 | ||
IT | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
RO | 20.09.2006 | ||
SI | 20.09.2006 | ||
SK | 20.09.2006 | ||
TR | 20.09.2006 | ||
AT | 28.11.2006 | ||
LU | 28.11.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
BG | 20.12.2006 | ||
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
GR | 21.12.2006 | ||
ES | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
HU | 21.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/32] | CZ | 20.09.2006 | |
EE | 20.09.2006 | ||
FI | 20.09.2006 | ||
GB | 20.09.2006 | ||
IE | 20.09.2006 | ||
IT | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
RO | 20.09.2006 | ||
SI | 20.09.2006 | ||
SK | 20.09.2006 | ||
AT | 28.11.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
BG | 20.12.2006 | ||
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
GR | 21.12.2006 | ||
ES | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
HU | 21.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 20.09.2006 | |
EE | 20.09.2006 | ||
FI | 20.09.2006 | ||
GB | 20.09.2006 | ||
IE | 20.09.2006 | ||
IT | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
RO | 20.09.2006 | ||
SI | 20.09.2006 | ||
SK | 20.09.2006 | ||
AT | 28.11.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
BG | 20.12.2006 | ||
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
GR | 21.12.2006 | ||
ES | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CZ | 20.09.2006 | |
FI | 20.09.2006 | ||
GB | 20.09.2006 | ||
IE | 20.09.2006 | ||
IT | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
RO | 20.09.2006 | ||
SI | 20.09.2006 | ||
SK | 20.09.2006 | ||
AT | 28.11.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
BG | 20.12.2006 | ||
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
GR | 21.12.2006 | ||
ES | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | CZ | 20.09.2006 | |
FI | 20.09.2006 | ||
GB | 20.09.2006 | ||
IE | 20.09.2006 | ||
IT | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
RO | 20.09.2006 | ||
SI | 20.09.2006 | ||
SK | 20.09.2006 | ||
AT | 28.11.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
BG | 20.12.2006 | ||
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
ES | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | CZ | 20.09.2006 | |
FI | 20.09.2006 | ||
GB | 20.09.2006 | ||
IE | 20.09.2006 | ||
IT | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
RO | 20.09.2006 | ||
SI | 20.09.2006 | ||
SK | 20.09.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
BG | 20.12.2006 | ||
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
ES | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/41] | CZ | 20.09.2006 | |
FI | 20.09.2006 | ||
GB | 20.09.2006 | ||
IE | 20.09.2006 | ||
IT | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
RO | 20.09.2006 | ||
SI | 20.09.2006 | ||
SK | 20.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
BG | 20.12.2006 | ||
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
ES | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/40] | CZ | 20.09.2006 | |
FI | 20.09.2006 | ||
GB | 20.09.2006 | ||
IE | 20.09.2006 | ||
IT | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
SI | 20.09.2006 | ||
SK | 20.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
BG | 20.12.2006 | ||
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
ES | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/35] | CZ | 20.09.2006 | |
FI | 20.09.2006 | ||
GB | 20.09.2006 | ||
IE | 20.09.2006 | ||
IT | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
SI | 20.09.2006 | ||
SK | 20.09.2006 | ||
BG | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
ES | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | CZ | 20.09.2006 | |
FI | 20.09.2006 | ||
GB | 20.09.2006 | ||
IE | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
SI | 20.09.2006 | ||
SK | 20.09.2006 | ||
BG | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
ES | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | CZ | 20.09.2006 | |
FI | 20.09.2006 | ||
IE | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
SI | 20.09.2006 | ||
SK | 20.09.2006 | ||
BG | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
ES | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | CZ | 20.09.2006 | |
FI | 20.09.2006 | ||
IE | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
SI | 20.09.2006 | ||
BG | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
ES | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CZ | 20.09.2006 | |
FI | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
SI | 20.09.2006 | ||
BG | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
ES | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/21] | FI | 20.09.2006 | |
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
SI | 20.09.2006 | ||
BG | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
ES | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | FI | 20.09.2006 | |
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
SI | 20.09.2006 | ||
BG | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | FI | 20.09.2006 | |
SI | 20.09.2006 | ||
BG | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2000108840 ; | [Y]DE2934060 (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [Y] 1,9,10,13,17 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE19948181 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [Y] 1,3,4,7 * column 3, line 3 - line 10 * * column 3, line 29 - line 32 *; | [Y]DE19957870 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [Y] 1-7,9-11,13,16 * abstract *; | [Y]DE19957869 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [Y] 1,2 * column 5, lines 5-14 * * column 6, line 42 - line 51; figures 1a,1b *; | [Y]DE10022094 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [Y] 1-7,9-11,13,16,17 * paragraphs [0024] - [0026]; figure - *; | [Y]DE10141628 (WITTE VELBERT GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 1-7,9-11,13,16,17 * paragraphs [0084] , [0085] , [0090] , [0091]; figures 18,19,30-33; claims 1-3 *; | [Y]US6375251 (TAGHADDOS HAMID [AE]) [Y] 1-6 * column 2, lines 3-43; figure 1 *; | [Y]DE10123479 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [Y] 1-7,9-11,13,16,17 * paragraphs [0017] , [0018]; figure - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000929), vol. 2000, no. 07, & JP2000108840 A 20000418 (MAZDA MOTOR CORP) [A] 3,7 * abstract * |