EP1424250 - Device for checking the locking state of a seat belt buckle for vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.07.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cherry GmbH Cherrystrasse 91275 Auerbach / DE | [2004/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hartmann, Robert Hans-Baltisberger-Str. 13 72770 Reutlingen / DE | 02 /
Zapf, Martin Ottmannsreuth 24 95473 Creussen / DE | [2004/23] | Representative(s) | Molnia, David Df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/23] | Molnia, David Dörries Frank-Molnia Pohlman, Triftstrasse 13 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03027378.3 | 27.11.2003 | [2004/23] | Priority number, date | DE2002155324 | 27.11.2002 Original published format: DE 10255324 | [2004/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1424250 | Date: | 02.06.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1424250 | Date: | 13.07.2005 | [2005/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60R22/48 | [2004/23] | CPC: |
B60R22/48 (EP,US);
B60R2022/4816 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/14] |
Former [2004/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Abfrage des Verriegelungszustandes eines Gurtschlosses für Fahrzeuge | [2004/23] | English: | Device for checking the locking state of a seat belt buckle for vehicles | [2004/23] | French: | Dispositif d'interrogation l'état de verrouillage d'un boucle de ceinture de sécurité pour véhicules | [2004/23] | Examination procedure | 04.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/40] | 14.01.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.05.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 12.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.03.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/35] | 11.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 17.02.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]EP0861763 (TRW VEHICLE SAFETY SYSTEMS [US]) [XD] 1,13,16,17 * abstract * * claims 1,2 * * column 3, lines 36-43 *; | [X]DE10058978 (TRW VEHICLE SAFETY SYSTEMS [US]) [X] 1,13,16,17* abstract * |