EP1431683 - Refrigerating device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2009 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. 55, Hondori 2-Chome, Keihan Moriguchi-shi Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/26] | For all designated states Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd 55, Hondori 2-Chome, Keihan Moriguchi-shi, Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsumoto, Kenzo 2105-3 Kokai Oizumi-machi Ora-gun Gunma-ken / JP | 02 /
Tsuda, Noriyuki 5-5-25, Sakata Oizumi-machi Ora-gun Gunma-ken / JP | 03 /
Kamimura, Ichiro 1999-5, Azami Kasekake-machi Nitta-gun Gunma 379-2311 / JP | 04 /
Kawabata, Toru 5-17-13, Asahi Oizumi-machi Ora-gun Gunma-ken / JP | 05 /
Watanabe, Masato 6-14, Sumiyoshi Oizumi-machi Ora-gun Gunma / JP | 06 /
Yoshizawa, Takashi 1191-5-50, Uchigashima-chou Ota-shi Gunma / JP | 07 /
Mukaiyama, Hiroshi 4-6-1-201, Sengoku Oizumi-machi Ora-gun Gunma / JP | 08 /
Kubo, Ryoko 986-5-H2-207, Yoshida Oizumi-machi Ora-gun Gunma / JP | [2004/26] | Representative(s) | Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/26] | Becker Kurig Straus Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03027473.2 | 01.12.2003 | [2004/26] | Priority number, date | JP20020369430 | 20.12.2002 Original published format: JP 2002369430 | [2004/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1431683 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1431683 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | [2004/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F25B9/00, C09K5/04 | [2004/26] | CPC: |
F25B9/006 (EP,US);
F25B1/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/26] | Title | German: | Kühlvorrichtung | [2004/26] | English: | Refrigerating device | [2004/26] | French: | Dispositif de réfrigération | [2004/26] | Examination procedure | 02.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/05] | 22.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH0617040 ; | [A]JP2002235072 ; | [A]JP2001019944 ; | [X]GB2085565 (VNI EX KI ELEKT MAGIN PRIBOROV) [X] 1 * abstract * * claims 6,7 *; | [A]US5360566 (STEVENSON RICHARD [US], et al); | [A]WO9707180 (ICI PLC [GB], et al); | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940421), vol. 0182, no. 22, Database accession no. (C - 1193), & JP06017040 A 19940125 (KURAIOTETSUKU KK) [X] 1 * abstract * * table 2 * | [X] - KIM S G ET AL, "Experiment and simulation on the performance of an autocascade refrigeration system using carbon dioxide as a refrigerant", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF REFRIGERATION, OXFORD, GB, (200212), vol. 25, no. 8, ISSN 0140-7007, pages 1093 - 1101, XP004388591 [X] 1 * page 1097, column L, line 1 - line 8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-7007(01)00110-4 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20021212), vol. 2002, no. 12, & JP2002235072 A 20020823 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010508), vol. 2000, no. 16, & JP2001019944 A 20010123 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] * abstract * | by applicant | JP2002106989 | JP2002188872 |