EP1430765 - Machine for mowing of stalk-like crop and releasable cleaning element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maschinenfabrik Kemper GmbH & Co. KG Breul 48973 Stadtlohn / DE | [2006/40] |
Former [2004/26] | For all designated states Maschinenfabrik Kemper GmbH & Co. KG Breul 48973 Stadtlohn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brüning, Ulrich Baakenesch 70 48653 Coesfeld / DE | [2004/26] | Representative(s) | Holst, Sönke John Deere GmbH & Co. KG Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/26] | Holst, Sönke, Dr. Deere & Company, European Office, Patent Department 68140 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 03027602.6 | 02.12.2003 | [2004/26] | Priority number, date | DE2002158013 | 12.12.2002 Original published format: DE 10258013 | [2004/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1430765 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1430765 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A01D43/08 | [2004/26] | CPC: |
A01D43/082 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/26] | Title | German: | Maschine zum Mähen von stängelartigem Erntegut und lösbarer Räumer | [2004/26] | English: | Machine for mowing of stalk-like crop and releasable cleaning element | [2004/26] | French: | Machine pour faucher des plantes à tige et élément de nettoyage détachable | [2004/26] | Examination procedure | 23.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/08] | 05.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 04.10.2006 | CZ | 04.10.2006 | EE | 04.10.2006 | FI | 04.10.2006 | IE | 04.10.2006 | NL | 04.10.2006 | RO | 04.10.2006 | SI | 04.10.2006 | SK | 04.10.2006 | TR | 04.10.2006 | AT | 02.12.2006 | LU | 02.12.2006 | MC | 31.12.2006 | BG | 04.01.2007 | DK | 04.01.2007 | SE | 04.01.2007 | GR | 05.01.2007 | ES | 15.01.2007 | PT | 16.03.2007 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | CZ | 04.10.2006 | |
EE | 04.10.2006 | ||
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
IE | 04.10.2006 | ||
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
RO | 04.10.2006 | ||
SI | 04.10.2006 | ||
SK | 04.10.2006 | ||
TR | 04.10.2006 | ||
AT | 02.12.2006 | ||
LU | 02.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 04.01.2007 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
GR | 05.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 04.10.2006 | |
EE | 04.10.2006 | ||
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
IE | 04.10.2006 | ||
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
RO | 04.10.2006 | ||
SI | 04.10.2006 | ||
SK | 04.10.2006 | ||
AT | 02.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 04.01.2007 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
GR | 05.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | CZ | 04.10.2006 | |
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
IE | 04.10.2006 | ||
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
RO | 04.10.2006 | ||
SI | 04.10.2006 | ||
SK | 04.10.2006 | ||
AT | 02.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 04.01.2007 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
GR | 05.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | CZ | 04.10.2006 | |
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
IE | 04.10.2006 | ||
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
RO | 04.10.2006 | ||
SI | 04.10.2006 | ||
SK | 04.10.2006 | ||
AT | 02.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 04.01.2007 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | CZ | 04.10.2006 | |
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
IE | 04.10.2006 | ||
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
RO | 04.10.2006 | ||
SI | 04.10.2006 | ||
SK | 04.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 04.01.2007 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/45] | CZ | 04.10.2006 | |
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
IE | 04.10.2006 | ||
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
RO | 04.10.2006 | ||
SI | 04.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 04.01.2007 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/42] | CZ | 04.10.2006 | |
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
IE | 04.10.2006 | ||
IT | 04.10.2006 | ||
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
RO | 04.10.2006 | ||
SI | 04.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 04.01.2007 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/41] | CZ | 04.10.2006 | |
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
IT | 04.10.2006 | ||
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
RO | 04.10.2006 | ||
SI | 04.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 04.01.2007 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/40] | CZ | 04.10.2006 | |
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
IT | 04.10.2006 | ||
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
SI | 04.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 04.01.2007 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | FI | 04.10.2006 | |
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
SI | 04.10.2006 | ||
BG | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 04.10.2006 | |
NL | 04.10.2006 | ||
SI | 04.10.2006 | ||
BG | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/21] | NL | 04.10.2006 | |
SI | 04.10.2006 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/19] | NL | 04.10.2006 | |
SI | 04.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | SI | 04.10.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0508189 (KEMPER GMBH MASCHF [DE]) [A] 1-13 * column 7, line 40 - column 8, line 16; figure 4 *; | [AD]EP0760200 (KEMPER GMBH MASCHF [DE]) [AD] 1-13 * column 4, line 22 - column 4, line 35; figure 3 *; | [AD]EP1040746 (CLAAS SAULGAU GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-3* figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]DE19933778 (KRONE BERNHARD GMBH MASCHF [DE]) [A] 1-13 * column 10, line 19 - column 11, line 14; figure 7 * |