Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
05.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] |
03.10.2008 | Definitive list of designations | published on 05.11.2008 [2008/45] |
08.08.2008 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
30.01.2008 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
25.01.2008 | Publication of search report | published on 27.02.2008 [2008/09] |
11.01.2007 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
12.01.2006 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
18.06.2004 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 04.08.2004 [2004/32] |