EP1443490 - Touchscreen display device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1, Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/32] | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1 Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujita, Hiroaki, Pioneer Corporation Kawagoe Works 25-1, Aza Nishi-machi Ohaza Yamada Kawagoe-shi Saitama / JP | 02 /
Ishizu, Kazunori, Pioneer Corporation Kawagoe Wks. 25-1, Aza Nishi-machi Ohaza Yamada Kawagoe-shi Saitama / JP | [2004/32] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/32] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03027793.3 | 03.12.2003 | [2004/32] | Priority number, date | JP20030002112 | 08.01.2003 Original published format: JP 2003002112 | [2004/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1443490 | Date: | 04.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1443490 | Date: | 27.02.2008 | [2008/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G09G5/00 | [2004/32] | CPC: |
G06F3/04886 (EP,US);
G06F3/0481 (EP,US);
G06F2203/04803 (EP,US);
G09G2340/0414 (EP,US);
G09G2340/0421 (EP,US);
G09G2340/0442 (EP,US);
G09G2340/125 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | [2008/45] |
Former [2004/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Anzeigegerät mit berührungsempfindlichem Bildschirm | [2004/32] | English: | Touchscreen display device | [2004/32] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage à écran tactile | [2004/32] | Examination procedure | 01.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/02] | 14.08.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2007 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5844620 (COLEMAN MISTI [US], et al) [X] 1-20* column 21, line 1; figures 7,8 *; | [X]EP1113411 (THOMSON MULTIMEDIA SA [FR]) [X] 1-20 * paragraphs [0012] - [0014]; figures 4,5 *; | [X]JP2002055750 (CANON KK) [X] 1-20 * paragraphs [0004] , [0012] , [0029] - [0031] - [0180] - [0182]; figures 48,50,51,53,54 * |