blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1471675

EP1471675 - Multirate CDMA system based on orthogonal bipolar spreading vectors [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  15.12.2006
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip15.12.2006Refusal of applicationpublished on 17.01.2007  [2007/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NORTHROP CORPORATION
1840 Century Park East Century City Los Angeles
California 90067-2199 / US
[N/P]
Former [2004/44]For all designated states
NORTHROP CORPORATION
1840 Century Park East Century City
Los Angeles California 90067-2199 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Linsky, Stuart T.
21 Golden Spur Lane
Rancho Palos Verdes, CA 90275 / US
02 / Wright, David A.
Deceased / US
 [2004/44]
Representative(s)Schmidt, Steffen J.
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/44]Schmidt, Steffen J., Dipl.-Ing.
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date03027814.703.12.2003
[2004/44]
Priority number, dateUS2003042108123.04.2003         Original published format: US 421081
[2004/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1471675
Date:27.10.2004
Language:EN
[2004/44]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1471675
Date:10.11.2004
[2004/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.09.2004
ClassificationIPC:H04J11/00, G06F17/14
[2004/45]
CPC:
H04B1/7093 (EP,US); H04J13/0048 (EP,US); H04B2201/70703 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2004/44]H04J11/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2005/30]
Former [2004/44]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Multirate CDMA System basierend auf orthogonalen bipolaren Spreizvektoren[2004/44]
English:Multirate CDMA system based on orthogonal bipolar spreading vectors[2004/44]
French:Système CDMA utilisant des vecteurs d'étalement orthogonaux et bipolaires.[2004/44]
Examination procedure07.04.2005Examination requested  [2005/23]
11.05.2005Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
17.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.09.2005Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
17.10.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.06.2006Date of oral proceedings
09.07.2006Application refused, date of legal effect [2007/03]
31.07.2006Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
16.08.2006Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2007/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
14.06.2005AT   M01   Not yet paid
14.06.2005BE   M01   Not yet paid
14.06.2005BG   M01   Not yet paid
14.06.2005CH   M01   Not yet paid
14.06.2005CY   M01   Not yet paid
14.06.2005CZ   M01   Not yet paid
14.06.2005DK   M01   Not yet paid
14.06.2005EE   M01   Not yet paid
14.06.2005ES   M01   Not yet paid
14.06.2005FI   M01   Not yet paid
14.06.2005GR   M01   Not yet paid
14.06.2005HU   M01   Not yet paid
14.06.2005IE   M01   Not yet paid
14.06.2005IT   M01   Not yet paid
14.06.2005LU   M01   Not yet paid
14.06.2005MC   M01   Not yet paid
14.06.2005NL   M01   Not yet paid
14.06.2005PT   M01   Not yet paid
14.06.2005RO   M01   Not yet paid
14.06.2005SE   M01   Not yet paid
14.06.2005SI   M01   Not yet paid
14.06.2005SK   M01   Not yet paid
14.06.2005TR   M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0993127  (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0013]; figures 2-5 *;
 [X]  - HARRI HOLMA, ANTTI TOSKALA, WCDMA for UMTS, WEST SUSSEX, ENGLAND, JOHN WILEY & SONS, (2000), XP002294931 [X] 1,2,9,10 * page 79 - page 80 *
 [A]  - PETERSON R L ET AL, "Biorthogonal multicode modulation for high-rate high-reliability personal communications requiring controlled peak-to-average transmit power ratio", BROADBAND COMMUNICATIONS, 2000. PROCEEDINGS. 2000 INTERNATIONAL ZURICH SEMINAR ON ZURICH, SWITZERLAND 15-17 FEB. 2000, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (20000215), ISBN 0-7803-5977-1, pages 263 - 270, XP010376469 [A] 1-4,9,10 * page 263, column 2, paragraph 3 - page 264, column 1, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IZSBC.2000.829261
 [A]  - NO J-S ET AL, "PERFORMANCE ANALYSIS OF CDMA SYSTEMS BY USING BIORTHOGONAL CODES", ASIA PACIFIC CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS, XX, XX, (1995), vol. 1, pages 326 - 330, XP000863332 [A] 1-4,9,10 * figure 3 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.