EP1431792 - Strippable cable [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 15.09.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.2006 | Refusal of application | published on 18.10.2006 [2006/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Draka Comteq B.V. Boorstraat 2 1021 JZ Amsterdam / NL | [2005/39] |
Former [2004/26] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rossi, Michael T. 1079 Oakwood Drive Maiden North Carolina 28650 / US | [2004/26] | Representative(s) | Dohmen, Johannes Maria Gerardus Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/44] | Dohmen, Johannes Maria Gerardus Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2004/26] | Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker Patentanwälte, Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 03027894.9 | 05.12.2003 | [2004/26] | Priority number, date | US20020319617 | 16.12.2002 Original published format: US 319617 | [2004/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1431792 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1431792 | Date: | 11.08.2004 | [2004/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/44, H01B1/00 | [2004/33] | CPC: |
G02B6/4431 (EP,US);
G02B6/4429 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/26] | G02B6/44, H01B11/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/26] | Title | German: | Auftrennbares Kabel | [2004/26] | English: | Strippable cable | [2004/26] | French: | Câble dissociable | [2004/26] | Examination procedure | 17.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/11] | 03.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.05.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2006/42] | 09.06.2006 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2006/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH03156410 ; | [YA]JP2000028877 ; | [YA]US2204782 (WERMINE HUGO H) [Y] 15 * page 3, column L, lines 31-63 * * figures 4,8,11 * [A] 1,8-11; | [A]EP0945746 (FUJIKURA LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1,3,5,8,15,17,20 * paragraphs [0050] , [0058] , [0080] * * figures 4,9 *; | [A]EP1168024 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [A] 14* abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911003), vol. 015, no. 391, Database accession no. (P - 1259), & JP03156410 A 19910704 (TOYOKUNI DENSEN KK) [X] 1,2,4,6,7,12,16,18,19 * abstract * | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000831), vol. 2000, no. 04, & JP2000028877 A 20000128 (HITACHI CABLE LTD) [Y] 15 * abstract * [A] 1,5,8-11 | Examination | US4815814 |