EP1426384 - Process for the preparation of low molecular weight hydrogenated nitrile rubber [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.02.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2011 | Change - classification | published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] | 23.09.2011 | Change - classification | published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lanxess Inc. 1265 Vidal Street South Sarnia, Ontario N7T 7M2 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2005/30] | For all designated states Lanxess Inc. 1265 Vidal Street South Sarnia, Ontario N7T 7M2 / CA | ||
Former [2004/24] | For all designated states Bayer Inc. 1265 Vidal Street South Sarnia, ON N7T 7M2 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ong, Christopher M. 1560 Proudfoot Lane No.1104 London Ontario N6H 5C9 / CA | 02 /
Guerin, Frédéric 520 Wellington Street Petrolia Ontario N0N 1R0 / CA | 03 /
Guo, Sharon X. 71 Dixon Road Stratford Ontario 5NA 6X9 / CA | [2004/24] | Representative(s) | Zobel, Manfred, et al LANXESS Deutschland GmbH LIP IPR 51369 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Zobel, Manfred, et al LANXESS Deutschland GmbH LIP IPR 51369 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [2005/30] | Zobel, Manfred, Dr., et al LANXESS Deutschland GmbH, LIP-IPR Building Q 18 51369 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [2004/24] | Schneider, Jürgen, Dr. Bayer AG Konzernbereich RP, Patente und Lizenzen 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Application number, filing date | 03027956.6 | 04.12.2003 | [2004/24] | Priority number, date | CA20022413607 | 05.12.2002 Original published format: CA 2413607 | [2004/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1426384 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C08C19/08, C08F8/50, C08F236/12 | [2004/24] | CPC: |
C08C19/08 (EP,US);
C08F236/12 (EP,US);
C08F8/04 (EP,US);
C08K3/36 (EP,US);
C08L15/005 (EP,US);
C08L9/02 (EP,US);
C08L13/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08K3/36, C08L9/02 (EP,US);
C08L15/005, C08L2666/08 (US,EP);
C08L9/02, C08L2666/08 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/09] |
Former [2004/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von hydriertem Nitrilkautschuk mit niedrigem Molekulargewicht | [2004/24] | English: | Process for the preparation of low molecular weight hydrogenated nitrile rubber | [2004/24] | French: | Procédé de préparation de caoutchouc nitrile hydrogéné à bas poids moléculaire | [2004/24] | Examination procedure | 09.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/06] | 08.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.01.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/13] | 16.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5446102 (OZIOMEK JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 3, line 31 - column 4, line 27 * * column 4, lines 40-56 * * column 5, line 58 - column 6, line 47 *; | [X]EP1152029 (NIPPON ZEON CO [JP]) [X] 11-17 * page 2, lines 35-39 * * page 3, lines 21-24 * * page 4, lines 30-34 * * page 4, line 44 - page 5, line 17 ** page 5, lines 36-39 *; | [X]US2002111432 (OBRECHT WERNER [DE], et al) [X] 11-17 * column 3, paragraph 17 * * column 4, paragraphs 32-34 * * column 5, paragraphs 37-39 * * tables 1,2 *; | [A] - JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR CATALYSIS, (1988), vol. 46, pages 433 - 444, XP008028060 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0304-5102(88)85114-9 |