EP1444944 - Exhaust filter for housings of floor care devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stein & Co. GmbH Wülfrather Strasse 47-49 D-42553 Velbert / DE | [2004/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stein, Thomas Eichenstrasse 30 42553 Velbert / DE | [2004/33] | Representative(s) | Hansmann, Dierk Patentanwälte Hansmann-Klickow-Hansmann Jessenstrasse 4 22767 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Hansmann, Dierk Patentanwälte Hansmann-Klickow-Hansmann Jessenstrasse 4 22767 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2004/33] | Hansmann, Dierk, Dipl.-Ing. Jessenstrasse 4 22767 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 03027981.4 | 05.12.2003 | [2004/33] | Priority number, date | DE2003105217 | 07.02.2003 Original published format: DE 10305217 | [2004/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1444944 | Date: | 11.08.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1444944 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | [2005/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1444944 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/34] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1444944 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | [2008/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A47L9/00, A47L9/12 | [2004/33] | CPC: |
A47L9/127 (EP,US);
A47L9/0081 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2006/12] |
Former [2004/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Ausblasfilter für Gehäuse von Bodenpflegegeräten | [2004/33] | English: | Exhaust filter for housings of floor care devices | [2004/33] | French: | Filtre aspirateur pour les caissons des appareils pour le nettoyage de sols | [2004/33] | Examination procedure | 08.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/36] | 21.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH10192196 ; | [XY]EP0028741 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,4,5 * page 3, paragraph 1; figure - * [Y] 1-3; | [A]DE8805982U (MAIER, LOTHAR, 6000 FRANKFURT, DE) [A] * page 5, paragraph 1; figure 1 *; | [A]DE19858562 (BROZIO GERARD [DE]) [A] * column 3, lines 3-6; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]EP1086647 (KAERCHER GMBH & CO ALFRED [DE]) [Y] 2 * paragraph [0015]; figures 2,4 *; | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981031), vol. 1998, no. 12, & JP10192196 A 19980728 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [Y] 1 * abstract * | [Y] - "CHORES WITH A BREATH OF FRESH AIR", DESIGN ENGINEERING, MORGAN-GRAMPIAN LTD. LONDON, GB, (19920601), ISSN 0308-8448, page 6, XP000305349 [Y] 3 * paragraph [0004] * |