18.09.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] |
14.08.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] |
17.07.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2009 [2009/34] |
01.05.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.06.2009 [2009/23] |
06.03.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2009 [2009/15] |
20.02.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.03.2009 [2009/13] |
30.01.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.03.2009 [2009/10] |
24.10.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.11.2008 [2008/48] |
12.09.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] |
12.09.2008 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] |
29.08.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] |
22.08.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] |
01.08.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] |
25.07.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] |
11.07.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] |
23.05.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.06.2008 [2008/26] |
16.05.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.06.2008 [2008/25] |
09.05.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.06.2008 [2008/24] |
05.10.2007 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] |
03.10.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
03.10.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
03.08.2007 |
Change - representative |
published on 05.09.2007 [2007/36] |
08.05.2007 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
13.01.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.06.2006 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 19.07.2006 [2006/29] |
01.04.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
14.01.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.12.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
29.11.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
27.08.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
29.06.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
15.06.2005 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
15.06.2005 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
04.03.2005 |
First examination report |
|
03.03.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
18.02.2005 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 06.04.2005 [2005/14] |
28.01.2005 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.03.2005 [2005/11] |
28.05.2004 |
Publication of search report |
published on 14.07.2004 [2004/29] |
30.04.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 16.06.2004 [2004/25] |