Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005031639 | Global Dossier | 07.04.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10344049 | 23.09.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1724713 | Global Dossier | 24.01.2007 | A3 | EP1724713 | 22.11.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE10344049 | 23.09.2003 | DE10258158 | 12.12.2002 | EP03028151 | 08.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1668571 | Global Dossier | 20.07.2011 | B1 | EP1668571 | 14.06.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10344049 | 23.09.2003 | WO2004EP10544 | 20.09.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE517396T | 15.08.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE10344049 | 23.09.2003 | WO2004EP10544 | 20.09.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1429283 | Global Dossier | 07.11.2007 | B1 | EP1429283 | 14.07.2004 | A3 | EP1429283 | 16.06.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE10344049 | 23.09.2003 | DE10258158 | 12.12.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE377808T | 15.11.2007 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE10344049 | 23.09.2003 | DE10258158 | 12.12.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE10344049 | 24.06.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10344049 | 23.09.2003 | DE10258158 | 12.12.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE50308533D1 | 20.12.2007 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE10344049 | 23.09.2003 | DE10258158 | 12.12.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2294237T | 01.04.2008 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE10344049 | 23.09.2003 | DE10258158 | 12.12.2002 | Type | Divisional application | EP1724713 |