EP1429283 - Portable data carrier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.09.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Giesecke & Devrient GmbH Prinzregentenstrasse 159 81677 München / DE | [2004/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Linke, Andreas, Prof. Dr. Richteranger 8 83623 Dietramszell / DE | [2004/25] | Representative(s) | Dendorfer, Claus Dendorfer & Herrmann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Neuhauser Straße 47 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/36] | Dendorfer, Claus Dendorfer & Herrmann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Bayerstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03028151.3 | 08.12.2003 | [2004/25] | Priority number, date | DE2002158158 | 12.12.2002 Original published format: DE 10258158 | DE2003144049 | 23.09.2003 Original published format: DE 10344049 | [2004/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1429283 | Date: | 16.06.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1429283 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | [2004/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1429283 | Date: | 07.11.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/077 | [2004/25] | CPC: |
G06K19/07732 (EP);
G06K19/041 (EP);
G06K19/077 (EP);
G06K19/07733 (EP);
G06K19/07743 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/25] | Title | German: | Tragbarer Datenträger | [2004/25] | English: | Portable data carrier | [2004/25] | French: | Support de données portatif | [2004/25] | Examination procedure | 14.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/11] | 07.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06008084.3 / EP1724713 | Opposition(s) | 08.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 07.11.2007 | CZ | 07.11.2007 | DK | 07.11.2007 | EE | 07.11.2007 | FI | 07.11.2007 | RO | 07.11.2007 | SI | 07.11.2007 | SK | 07.11.2007 | TR | 07.11.2007 | AT | 08.12.2007 | LU | 08.12.2007 | IE | 10.12.2007 | CH | 31.12.2007 | LI | 31.12.2007 | MC | 31.12.2007 | BG | 07.02.2008 | SE | 07.02.2008 | GR | 08.02.2008 | PT | 07.04.2008 | HU | 08.05.2008 | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/38] | CY | 07.11.2007 | |
CZ | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
EE | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
AT | 08.12.2007 | ||
LU | 08.12.2007 | ||
IE | 10.12.2007 | ||
CH | 31.12.2007 | ||
LI | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | CY | 07.11.2007 | |
CZ | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
EE | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
AT | 08.12.2007 | ||
IE | 10.12.2007 | ||
CH | 31.12.2007 | ||
LI | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | CZ | 07.11.2007 | |
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
EE | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
AT | 08.12.2007 | ||
IE | 10.12.2007 | ||
CH | 31.12.2007 | ||
LI | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | CZ | 07.11.2007 | |
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
EE | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
IE | 10.12.2007 | ||
CH | 31.12.2007 | ||
LI | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | CZ | 07.11.2007 | |
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
EE | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
IE | 10.12.2007 | ||
CH | 31.12.2007 | ||
LI | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | CZ | 07.11.2007 | |
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
IE | 10.12.2007 | ||
CH | 31.12.2007 | ||
LI | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | CZ | 07.11.2007 | |
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | CZ | 07.11.2007 | |
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | CZ | 07.11.2007 | |
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/33] | SI | 07.11.2007 | |
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | SI | 07.11.2007 | |
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | BG | 07.02.2008 | |
SE | 07.02.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3702464 (CASTRUCCI PAUL P) [X] 1* column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 67; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0409241 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 6-11 * column 3, line 7 - column 6, line 25; figure 8 *; | [XY]DE29819389U (ORGA KARTENSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,4,6-8,10,12-14,16,17,20,22 * page 2, line 4 - page 5, line 12; figure 2; claims 1-5 * [Y] 9,11,15; | [XY]DE19737565 (ETR ELEKTRONIK UND TECHNOLOGIE [DE]) [X] 1,4,6-8,10,12,22 * column 2, line 19 - column 4, line 63; figures 1,2 * [Y] 9,11; | [A]WO0016255 (SCHLUMBERGER SYSTEMS & SERVICE [FR], et al) [A] 6-11 * abstract *; | [X]WO0073988 (GEMPLUS CARD INT [FR], et al) [X] 1,4 * page 4, line 8 - page 7, line 12; figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [XY]WO0196990 (RAINBOW TECHNOLOGIES B V [NL]) [X] 1-3 * page 3, line 26 - page 9, line 25; figures 1,3 * [Y] 11,15; | [E]WO03027946 (GEMPLUS CARD INT [FR], et al) [E] 1-3 * page 1, line 1 - page 1, line 16; figures 5,8A,8B,9 * * page 3, line 1 - page 10, line 15 * |