EP1428967 - Thermally insulated metal section member in particular for facades, doors and windows [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.2007 [2007/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkenjohann, Johann Oesterwieher Strasse 80 33415 Verl / DE | [2004/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/25] | Representative(s) | Strauss, Hans-Jochen Vennstrasse 9 33330 Gütersloh / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/25] | Strauss, Hans-Jochen, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. Vennstrasse 9 33330 Gütersloh / DE | Application number, filing date | 03028351.9 | 10.12.2003 | [2004/25] | Priority number, date | DE2002219196U | 11.12.2002 Original published format: DE 20219196 U | [2004/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1428967 | Date: | 16.06.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1428967 | Date: | 09.03.2005 | [2005/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | E06B3/263 | [2004/25] | CPC: |
E06B3/2632 (EP);
E06B2003/26352 (EP);
E06B2003/26381 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, NL [2005/48] |
Former [2004/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Thermisch isoliertes Metallprofil insbesondere für Fassaden, Türen und Fenster | [2004/25] | English: | Thermally insulated metal section member in particular for facades, doors and windows | [2004/25] | French: | Profilé métallique thermiquement isolé en particulier pour façades, portes et fenêtres | [2004/25] | Examination procedure | 29.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/26] | 23.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/18] | 11.12.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2006 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0022271 (SCHUECO INT KG [DE]) [X] 1-3* page 5, line 29 - page 6, line 17; figures 1,2 *; | [X]EP1215360 (CAPRANO & BRUNNHOFER [DE]) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 18 - line 32 * * column 2, line 19 - line 49 * * column 5, line 5 - line 33 * * column 8, line 11 - column 9, line 10 * * figures 3-7 * |