EP1463174 - Metal-clad gas-insulated switchgear [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.2011 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AREVA T&D SA Tour Areva 1, place de la coupole 92084 Paris La Defense / FR | [2006/12] |
Former [2004/40] | For all designated states Alstom 38 avenue Kleber 75116 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Starck, Thierry Tauberweg 4 93105 Tegernheim / DE | 02 /
Heinzelmann, Werner Kaiser-Friedrich-Allee 15 93051 Regensburg / DE | [2004/40] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/40] | Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker Patentanwälte, Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 03028392.3 | 11.12.2003 | [2004/40] | Priority number, date | DE2003114458 | 28.03.2003 Original published format: DE 10314458 | [2004/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1463174 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1463174 | Date: | 10.03.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H02B13/035 | [2004/40] | CPC: |
H02B1/22 (EP);
H02B13/0358 (EP);
H02B13/045 (EP);
H02B13/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/40] | Title | German: | Metallgekapselte gasisolierte Schaltanlage | [2004/40] | English: | Metal-clad gas-insulated switchgear | [2004/40] | French: | Appareillage de commutation blindé métallique à isolement gazeux | [2004/40] | Examination procedure | 18.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/03] | 20.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 10.03.2010 | CZ | 10.03.2010 | DK | 10.03.2010 | EE | 10.03.2010 | FI | 10.03.2010 | IE | 10.03.2010 | IT | 10.03.2010 | RO | 10.03.2010 | SE | 10.03.2010 | SI | 10.03.2010 | SK | 10.03.2010 | TR | 10.03.2010 | BG | 10.06.2010 | GR | 11.06.2010 | PT | 12.07.2010 | HU | 11.09.2010 | AT | 11.12.2010 | LU | 11.12.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | CY | 10.03.2010 | |
CZ | 10.03.2010 | ||
DK | 10.03.2010 | ||
EE | 10.03.2010 | ||
FI | 10.03.2010 | ||
IE | 10.03.2010 | ||
IT | 10.03.2010 | ||
RO | 10.03.2010 | ||
SE | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | ||
SK | 10.03.2010 | ||
BG | 10.06.2010 | ||
GR | 11.06.2010 | ||
PT | 12.07.2010 | ||
HU | 11.09.2010 | ||
AT | 11.12.2010 | ||
LU | 11.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 10.03.2010 | |
CZ | 10.03.2010 | ||
DK | 10.03.2010 | ||
EE | 10.03.2010 | ||
FI | 10.03.2010 | ||
IE | 10.03.2010 | ||
IT | 10.03.2010 | ||
RO | 10.03.2010 | ||
SE | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | ||
SK | 10.03.2010 | ||
BG | 10.06.2010 | ||
GR | 11.06.2010 | ||
PT | 12.07.2010 | ||
HU | 11.09.2010 | ||
AT | 11.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/11] | CY | 10.03.2010 | |
CZ | 10.03.2010 | ||
DK | 10.03.2010 | ||
EE | 10.03.2010 | ||
FI | 10.03.2010 | ||
IE | 10.03.2010 | ||
IT | 10.03.2010 | ||
RO | 10.03.2010 | ||
SE | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | ||
SK | 10.03.2010 | ||
BG | 10.06.2010 | ||
GR | 11.06.2010 | ||
PT | 12.07.2010 | ||
AT | 11.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | CY | 10.03.2010 | |
CZ | 10.03.2010 | ||
DK | 10.03.2010 | ||
EE | 10.03.2010 | ||
FI | 10.03.2010 | ||
IE | 10.03.2010 | ||
IT | 10.03.2010 | ||
RO | 10.03.2010 | ||
SE | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | ||
SK | 10.03.2010 | ||
BG | 10.06.2010 | ||
GR | 11.06.2010 | ||
PT | 12.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | CY | 10.03.2010 | |
CZ | 10.03.2010 | ||
DK | 10.03.2010 | ||
EE | 10.03.2010 | ||
FI | 10.03.2010 | ||
IE | 10.03.2010 | ||
RO | 10.03.2010 | ||
SE | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | ||
SK | 10.03.2010 | ||
BG | 10.06.2010 | ||
GR | 11.06.2010 | ||
PT | 12.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | CY | 10.03.2010 | |
CZ | 10.03.2010 | ||
DK | 10.03.2010 | ||
EE | 10.03.2010 | ||
FI | 10.03.2010 | ||
IE | 10.03.2010 | ||
RO | 10.03.2010 | ||
SE | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | ||
SK | 10.03.2010 | ||
BG | 10.06.2010 | ||
GR | 11.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/51] | CY | 10.03.2010 | |
CZ | 10.03.2010 | ||
EE | 10.03.2010 | ||
FI | 10.03.2010 | ||
RO | 10.03.2010 | ||
SE | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | ||
SK | 10.03.2010 | ||
BG | 10.06.2010 | ||
GR | 11.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | CY | 10.03.2010 | |
CZ | 10.03.2010 | ||
EE | 10.03.2010 | ||
FI | 10.03.2010 | ||
RO | 10.03.2010 | ||
SE | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | ||
SK | 10.03.2010 | ||
GR | 11.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/48] | CY | 10.03.2010 | |
EE | 10.03.2010 | ||
FI | 10.03.2010 | ||
RO | 10.03.2010 | ||
SE | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | ||
GR | 11.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/38] | FI | 10.03.2010 | |
SI | 10.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | SI | 10.03.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH05304704 ; | [A]US5003427 (REICHL ERWIN [DE], et al) [A] 1* figures 4,6,10a,10b,11,13 *; | [X]EP1107408 (MEIDENSHA ELECTRIC MFG CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * column 5, line 7 - line 15; figures 1,4 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940222), vol. 0181, no. 09, Database accession no. (E - 1513), & JP05304704 A 19931116 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1 * abstract * |