|
02.04.2013 |
Communication to the parties concerning termination of the opposition proceedings - opposition rejected - no appeal lodged |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.04.2013 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2013 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.01.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2012 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.12.2012 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2012 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.12.2012 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
14.12.2012 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2012 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2012 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2012 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
14.12.2012 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
12.11.2012 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.10.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
13.10.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
13.10.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
13.10.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.10.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
11.10.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
17 |
|
20.06.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.2012 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.06.2012 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.06.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.06.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.2012 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.06.2012 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.06.2012 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.06.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.06.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.05.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.05.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.05.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.05.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.2012 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.05.2012 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.05.2012 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.05.2012 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.05.2012 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.05.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2012 |
General enquiry |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.2012 |
General enquiry |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.2011 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.2011 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.08.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.08.2011 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.08.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2011 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.2011 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
5 |
|
24.05.2011 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
5 |
|
07.03.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.2011 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.03.2011 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.02.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2011 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.11.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2009 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
7 |
|
23.11.2009 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
7 |
|
22.10.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2009 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.10.2009 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.09.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.2009 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.2009 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.07.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.06.2009 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.2009 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.05.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.05.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.05.2009 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
08.05.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.05.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.05.2009 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
20.02.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2009 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2008 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2008 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2008 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2008 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.10.2008 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
31 |
|
02.10.2008 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.10.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
27 |
|
02.10.2008 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
01.10.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
01.10.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.10.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.10.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
01.10.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
01.10.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.10.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.10.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
01.10.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
01.10.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
01.10.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.10.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.10.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
01.10.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.10.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
01.10.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.10.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
01.10.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
01.10.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
01.10.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
01.10.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.10.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.2008 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
01.10.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
01.10.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
01.10.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
01.10.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
01.10.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
01.10.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
01.10.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
01.10.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
01.10.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
01.10.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
01.10.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
25.09.2008 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.09.2008 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.09.2008 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2007 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.10.2007 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
04.10.2007 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2007 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
05.07.2007 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.07.2007 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.07.2007 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
16.12.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.12.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2006 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2006 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.02.2006 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2006 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.06.2004 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2003 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2003 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
11.12.2003 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.12.2003 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.12.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
11.12.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
11.12.2003 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.12.2003 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.12.2003 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |