Designated contracting states | AT | Lapse: 11.12.2008 | BE | Lapse: 31.12.2008 | BG | Lapse: 02.04.2008 | CH | Lapse: 31.12.2008 | CY | Lapse: 02.01.2008 | CZ | Lapse: 02.01.2008 | DE | | DK | Lapse: 02.01.2008 | EE | Lapse: 02.01.2008 | ES | | FI | Lapse: 02.01.2008 | FR | | GB | | GR | Lapse: 03.04.2008 | HU | Lapse: 03.07.2008 | IE | | IT | | LI | Lapse: 31.12.2008 | LU | Lapse: 11.12.2008 | MC | Lapse: 31.12.2008 | NL | | PT | Lapse: 02.06.2008 | RO | Lapse: 02.01.2008 | SE | Lapse: 02.04.2008 | SI | Lapse: 02.01.2008 | SK | Lapse: 02.01.2008 | TR | Lapse: 02.01.2008 | Examination procedure | 15.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | European patent granted | 02.01.2008 | Opposition procedure | 14.12.2012 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | | INPADOC data Tooltip | The EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority. | Event date: | 21.07.2004 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A2 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Event date: | 21.07.2004 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Countries concerned: | AL LT LV MK | | Event date: | 22.03.2006 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A3 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Event date: | 22.03.2006 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Countries concerned: | AL LT LV MK | | Event date: | 06.09.2006 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20060725 | | Event date: | 04.10.2006 | | Event description: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20060830 | | Event date: | 29.11.2006 | | Event description: | DESIGNATION FEES PAID | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Event date: | 02.01.2008 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Event date: | 02.01.2008 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED | Free Format Text: | NOT ENGLISH | | Event date: | 23.01.2008 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND | Free Format Text: | LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN | | Event date: | 14.02.2008 | | Event description: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 50308909 | Country of Ref Document: | DE | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 20080214 | Kind Code of Ref Document: | P | | Event date: | 31.01.2008 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH EP | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI | | Event date: | 26.03.2008 | | Event description: | GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977) | Effective DATE: | 20080303 | | Event date: | 30.05.2008 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20080102 | | Event date: | 31.07.2008 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20080102 | | Event date: | 29.08.2008 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BG | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20080402 | | Event date: | 12.09.2008 | | Event description: | FR: TRANSLATION FILED | | Event date: | 30.09.2008 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20080602 | | Event date: | 29.10.2008 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED | OPPONENT: | CHRIST PACKING SYSTEMS GMBH & CO. KG | Effective DATE: | 20080923 | | Event date: | 31.10.2008 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CZ | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20080102 | | Event date: | 31.10.2008 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DK | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20080102 | | Event date: | 31.10.2008 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20080402 | | Event date: | 31.10.2008 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SK | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20080102 | | Event date: | 28.11.2008 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | RO | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20080102 | | Event date: | 05.01.2009 | | Event description: | NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO | OPPONENT: | CHRIST PACKING SYSTEMS GMBH & CO. KG | | Event date: | 01.05.2008 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FG2A 2297091 T3 | Code Expl.: | +DEFINITIVE PROTECTION | | Event date: | 30.04.2009 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | EE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20080102 | | Event date: | 31.07.2009 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PL | Code Expl.: | -PATENT CEASED | | Event date: | 31.07.2009 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CY | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20080102 | | Event date: | 31.07.2009 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MC | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20081231 | | Event date: | 30.09.2009 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20081231 | | Event date: | 30.10.2009 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20081231 | | Event date: | 30.10.2009 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20081231 | | Event date: | 30.06.2009 | | Event description: | BE: LAPSED | OWNER: | EMIL PESTER G.M.B.H. | Effective DATE: | 20081231 | | Event date: | 31.03.2010 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB 732E | Code Expl.: | AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977) | Free Format Text: | REGISTERED BETWEEN 20100304 AND 20100310 | | Event date: | 30.06.2010 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20081211 | | Event date: | 16.07.2010 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR TP | Code Expl.: | TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY | | Event date: | 30.07.2010 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | HU | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20080703 | | Event date: | 30.07.2010 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20081211 | | Event date: | 31.08.2010 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | TR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20080102 | | Event date: | 29.10.2010 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20080403 | | Event date: | 09.06.2010 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL SD | Code Expl.: | ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS | Effective DATE: | 20100525 | | Event date: | 01.05.2013 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION REJECTED | Effective DATE: | 20121112 | | Event date: | 27.06.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R100 50308909 DE | Code Expl.: | +EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT UNAMENDED NOW FINAL | Effective DATE: | 20121112 | | Event date: | 30.01.2015 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20141216 | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Event date: | 30.01.2015 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IE | Payment DATE: | 20141230 | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Event date: | 30.01.2015 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Payment DATE: | 20141215 | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Event date: | 27.02.2015 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Payment DATE: | 20141215 | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Event date: | 18.12.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 13 | | Event date: | 24.08.2016 | | Event description: | GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20151211 | | Event date: | 07.09.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL MM | Code Expl.: | -LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20160101 | | Event date: | 21.09.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE MM4A | Code Expl.: | -PATENT LAPSED | | Event date: | 31.10.2016 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20160101 | | Event date: | 31.10.2016 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20151211 | | Event date: | 31.10.2016 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20151211 | | Event date: | 21.12.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 27.01.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FD2A | Code Expl.: | -ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN | Effective DATE: | 20170127 | | Event date: | 28.02.2017 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20151212 | | Event date: | 19.12.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 15 | | Event date: | 30.11.2007 | | Event description: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Event date: | 27.11.2007 | | Event description: | GRANT FEE PAID | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3 | | Event date: | 03.07.2007 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Event date: | 03.02.2006 | | Event description: | SEARCH REPORT DESPATCHED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009013 | | Event date: | 04.06.2004 | | Event description: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Event date: | 29.03.2013 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: OPPOSITION REJECTED | | Event date: | 29.03.2013 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION REJECTED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009273 | | Event date: | 14.12.2012 | | Event description: | COMMUNICATION DESPATCHED THAT OPPOSITION WAS REJECTED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNREJ1 | | Event date: | 05.05.2009 | | Event description: | REPLY OF PATENT PROPRIETOR TO NOTICE(S) OF OPPOSITION RECEIVED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNOBS3 | | Event date: | 17.02.2009 | | Event description: | INFORMATION MODIFIED RELATED TO COMMUNICATION OF A NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND REQUEST TO FILE OBSERVATIONS + TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSCOBS2 | | Event date: | 11.11.2008 | | Event description: | NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND REQUEST TO FILE OBSERVATION + TIME LIMIT SENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNOBS2 | | Event date: | 04.11.2008 | | Event description: | NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND REQUEST TO FILE OBSERVATION + TIME LIMIT SENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNOBS2 | | Event date: | 26.09.2008 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009260 | | Event date: | 31.01.2023 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20221219 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 31.05.2023 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20221221 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 31.05.2023 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Payment DATE: | 20221230 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 11.12.2023 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R071 50308909 DE | Code Expl.: | -EXPIRY OF RIGHT | |