EP1428733 - Seatbelt use indicating apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.02.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.03.2008 [2008/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2007/13] |
Former [2004/25] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okita, Munechika c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
Oyabu, Masanori c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2007/11] |
Former [2004/25] | 01 /
Okita, Munechika Toyota Jidosha K. K. 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | ||
02 /
Oyabu, Masanori Toyota Jidosha K. K. 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/25] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 03028578.7 | 11.12.2003 | [2004/25] | Priority number, date | JP20020360488 | 12.12.2002 Original published format: JP 2002360488 | [2004/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1428733 | Date: | 16.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1428733 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B60R22/48 | [2004/25] | CPC: |
B60R22/48 (EP,US);
B60R2022/4816 (EP,US);
B60R2022/4866 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/10] |
Former [2004/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Anzeige des Sicherheitsgurtgebrauchs | [2007/12] | English: | Seatbelt use indicating apparatus | [2004/25] | French: | Dispositif d'indication de l'utilisation de la ceinture de sécurité | [2004/25] |
Former [2004/25] | Anzeigevorrichtung für den Sicherheitsgurtgebrauch | Examination procedure | 07.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/25] | 13.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3875556 (BEAIRD JESSE B) [X] 1-4* the whole document *; | [X]US4849733 (CONIGLIARO THOMAS S [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 61; figures 1,2; claims 1-4 *; | [X]US6059066 (LARY BANNING G [US]) [X] 1-5 * column A; figures 1,2,5; claims 1,2,4 *; | [X]US6215395 (SLAUGHTER RONALD JIM [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * column 3, line 9 - column 4, line 3; figures 1,3,4; claims 1-6 *; | [PX]FR2839287 (MAMY MAURICE [FR], et al) [PX] 1-6 * the whole document * |