EP1431452 - Apparatus for the formation of an extended nip [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.2011 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Andritz Küsters GmbH Eduard-Küsters-Strasse 1 47805 Krefeld / DE | [2010/32] |
Former [2007/50] | For all designated states Andritz Küsters GmbH Eduard-Küsters-Str. 1 47805 Krefeld / DE | ||
Former [2006/35] | For all designated states Andritz Küsters GmbH & Co. KG Eduard-Küsters-Strasse 1 47805 Krefeld / DE | ||
Former [2004/26] | For all designated states Eduard Küsters Maschinenfabrik GmbH & Co. KG Eduard-Küsters-Strasse 1 47805 Krefeld / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hader, Peter Fichtenweg 51 47906 Kempen / DE | 02 /
Brendel, Bernhard, Dr. Grasheiderstrasse 31 47929 Grefrath / DE | [2010/03] |
Former [2004/26] | 01 /
Hader, Peter Fichtenweg 51 47906 Kempen / DE | ||
02 /
Brendel, Bernhard, Dr. Grasheiderstrasse 31 47929 Grefath / DE | Representative(s) | Sparing Röhl Henseler Patentanwälte Rethelstrasse 123 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/26] | Sparing - Röhl - Henseler Patentanwälte Rethelstrasse 123 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 03028601.7 | 12.12.2003 | [2004/26] | Priority number, date | DE2002159232 | 17.12.2002 Original published format: DE 10259232 | [2004/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1431452 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1431452 | Date: | 30.06.2004 | [2004/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1431452 | Date: | 11.08.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | D21F3/02, D21G1/02, F16C13/00 | [2004/26] | CPC: |
D21G1/006 (EP,US);
D21F3/0218 (EP,US);
F16C13/026 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/26] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Bilden eines Langspalts | [2004/26] | English: | Apparatus for the formation of an extended nip | [2004/26] | French: | Dispositif pour formation d'une presse à ligne de contact élargie | [2004/26] | Examination procedure | 22.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/08] | 30.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 11.08.2010 | CZ | 11.08.2010 | DK | 11.08.2010 | EE | 11.08.2010 | IE | 11.08.2010 | NL | 11.08.2010 | RO | 11.08.2010 | SI | 11.08.2010 | SK | 11.08.2010 | TR | 11.08.2010 | BG | 11.11.2010 | GR | 12.11.2010 | ES | 22.11.2010 | LU | 12.12.2010 | PT | 13.12.2010 | BE | 31.12.2010 | CH | 31.12.2010 | LI | 31.12.2010 | MC | 31.12.2010 | HU | 12.02.2011 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | CY | 11.08.2010 | |
CZ | 11.08.2010 | ||
DK | 11.08.2010 | ||
EE | 11.08.2010 | ||
IE | 11.08.2010 | ||
NL | 11.08.2010 | ||
RO | 11.08.2010 | ||
SI | 11.08.2010 | ||
SK | 11.08.2010 | ||
BG | 11.11.2010 | ||
GR | 12.11.2010 | ||
ES | 22.11.2010 | ||
LU | 12.12.2010 | ||
PT | 13.12.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
HU | 12.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 11.08.2010 | |
CZ | 11.08.2010 | ||
DK | 11.08.2010 | ||
EE | 11.08.2010 | ||
IE | 11.08.2010 | ||
NL | 11.08.2010 | ||
RO | 11.08.2010 | ||
SI | 11.08.2010 | ||
SK | 11.08.2010 | ||
BG | 11.11.2010 | ||
GR | 12.11.2010 | ||
ES | 22.11.2010 | ||
PT | 13.12.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
HU | 12.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | CY | 11.08.2010 | |
CZ | 11.08.2010 | ||
DK | 11.08.2010 | ||
EE | 11.08.2010 | ||
IE | 11.08.2010 | ||
NL | 11.08.2010 | ||
RO | 11.08.2010 | ||
SI | 11.08.2010 | ||
SK | 11.08.2010 | ||
BG | 11.11.2010 | ||
GR | 12.11.2010 | ||
ES | 22.11.2010 | ||
PT | 13.12.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/45] | CY | 11.08.2010 | |
CZ | 11.08.2010 | ||
DK | 11.08.2010 | ||
EE | 11.08.2010 | ||
IE | 11.08.2010 | ||
NL | 11.08.2010 | ||
RO | 11.08.2010 | ||
SI | 11.08.2010 | ||
SK | 11.08.2010 | ||
BG | 11.11.2010 | ||
GR | 12.11.2010 | ||
ES | 22.11.2010 | ||
PT | 13.12.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/36] | CY | 11.08.2010 | |
CZ | 11.08.2010 | ||
DK | 11.08.2010 | ||
EE | 11.08.2010 | ||
IE | 11.08.2010 | ||
NL | 11.08.2010 | ||
RO | 11.08.2010 | ||
SI | 11.08.2010 | ||
SK | 11.08.2010 | ||
BG | 11.11.2010 | ||
GR | 12.11.2010 | ||
ES | 22.11.2010 | ||
PT | 13.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/31] | CY | 11.08.2010 | |
CZ | 11.08.2010 | ||
DK | 11.08.2010 | ||
EE | 11.08.2010 | ||
IE | 11.08.2010 | ||
NL | 11.08.2010 | ||
RO | 11.08.2010 | ||
SI | 11.08.2010 | ||
SK | 11.08.2010 | ||
BG | 11.11.2010 | ||
GR | 12.11.2010 | ||
ES | 22.11.2010 | ||
PT | 13.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/23] | CY | 11.08.2010 | |
CZ | 11.08.2010 | ||
DK | 11.08.2010 | ||
EE | 11.08.2010 | ||
IE | 11.08.2010 | ||
NL | 11.08.2010 | ||
SI | 11.08.2010 | ||
SK | 11.08.2010 | ||
BG | 11.11.2010 | ||
GR | 12.11.2010 | ||
PT | 13.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | CY | 11.08.2010 | |
DK | 11.08.2010 | ||
IE | 11.08.2010 | ||
NL | 11.08.2010 | ||
SI | 11.08.2010 | ||
BG | 11.11.2010 | ||
GR | 12.11.2010 | ||
PT | 13.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | CY | 11.08.2010 | |
NL | 11.08.2010 | ||
SI | 11.08.2010 | ||
BG | 11.11.2010 | ||
GR | 12.11.2010 | ||
PT | 13.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | CY | 11.08.2010 | |
NL | 11.08.2010 | ||
SI | 11.08.2010 | ||
BG | 11.11.2010 | ||
PT | 13.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/11] | NL | 11.08.2010 | |
SI | 11.08.2010 | ||
BG | 11.11.2010 | ||
PT | 13.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | NL | 11.08.2010 | |
SI | 11.08.2010 | ||
PT | 13.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | NL | 11.08.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4311622 (VOITH GMBH J M [DE]) [A] 1,10,11,13 * column 2, line 45 - column 2, line 54 ** column 3, line 36 - column 4, line 45; figure 3 *; | [A]EP0674043 (VOITH SULZER PAPIERMASCH GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-3,6,10,13 * column 4, line 13 - column 4, line 26; figure 1 *; | [X]DE19622018 (VOITH SULZER PAPIERMASCH GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,10 * column 6, line 54 - column 7, line 11; figures 2,3 *; | [A]EP0818572 (VOITH SULZER PAPIERMASCH GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-3,10,13 * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 15; figure 1 *; | [A]WO0104412 (VALMET KARLSTAD AB [SE], et al) [A] 1,2,10,11,15 * page 8, line 23 - page 8, line 30 * * page 9, line 19 - page 9, line 22; figure 2 * |