EP1445816 - Electronic apparatus system, and operation control method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.12.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.01.2007 [2007/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/33] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ozeki, Akihiro, Toshiba Corporation Intellectual Property Div. 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 02 /
Nakamura, Koji, Toshiba Corporation Intellectual Property Div. 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [2004/33] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/33] | Henkel, Feiler & Hänzel Möhlstrasse 37 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03028698.3 | 16.12.2003 | [2004/33] | Priority number, date | JP20030004369 | 10.01.2003 Original published format: JP 2003004369 | [2004/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1445816 | Date: | 11.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/04, H01M16/00 | [2004/33] | CPC: |
H01M8/04559 (EP,US);
H01M16/003 (EP,US);
H01M8/04201 (EP,US);
H01M8/04567 (EP,US);
H01M8/04589 (EP,US);
H01M8/04597 (EP,US);
H01M8/0494 (EP,US);
H01M8/04947 (EP,US);
H01M8/04955 (EP,US);
H01M8/1011 (EP,US);
H01M2250/30 (EP,US);
Y02B90/10 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/18] |
Former [2004/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektronisches Vorrichtungssystem und Betriebssteuerungsmethode | [2004/33] | English: | Electronic apparatus system, and operation control method | [2004/33] | French: | Système d'appareillage électronique et méthode de commande de fonctionnement | [2004/33] | Examination procedure | 16.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/33] | 13.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/04] | 05.09.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1304092 (ROBERT BOSCH GMBH) [X] 1-8 *page 1, column 1, line 43 to column 2, line 54; page 2, column 1, lines 21-52 and column 2, lines 84-87*; | [X]US4677037 (TAKABAYASHI YASUHIRO [JP]) [X] 1-8 * column 1, line 62 - line 68 *; | [X]EP1091437 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-8 * claims 1-5 *; | [A]EP1233468 (DELPHI TECH INC [US]) [A] 1-8* the whole document *; | [E]WO2004032269 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [E] 1-8 * claims 1-5 * |