EP1437114 - Pivotable leg support with automatic length adjustment for a wheelchair [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEYRA WILHELM MEYER GMBH & CO. KG Meyra-Ring 2 D-32689 Kalletal-Kalldorf / DE | [2006/44] |
Former [2004/29] | For all designated states MEYRA WILHELM MEYER GMBH & CO. KG Meyra-Ring 2 D-32689 Kalletal-Kalldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Müller, Veit Lindscheid 10 42929 Wermelskirchen / DE | [2004/29] | Representative(s) | Schmitz, Hans-Werner Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/29] | Schmitz, Hans-Werner, Dipl.-Ing. Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Gabriel-Max-Strasse 29 81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03028738.7 | 12.12.2003 | [2004/29] | Priority number, date | DE2003100945 | 13.01.2003 Original published format: DE 10300945 | [2004/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1437114 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1437114 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61G5/12 | [2004/29] | CPC: |
A61G5/12 (EP);
A61G5/128 (EP);
A61G2203/74 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/29] | Title | German: | Winkelverstellbare Beinstütze mit automatischem Längenausgleich für einen Rollstuhl | [2004/29] | English: | Pivotable leg support with automatic length adjustment for a wheelchair | [2004/29] | French: | Repose-jambes pour fauteuils roulants, articulable et de longeur ajustable automatiquement | [2004/29] | Examination procedure | 26.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/44] | 23.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 02.11.2006 | CZ | 02.11.2006 | EE | 02.11.2006 | FI | 02.11.2006 | IE | 02.11.2006 | RO | 02.11.2006 | SI | 02.11.2006 | SK | 02.11.2006 | TR | 02.11.2006 | LU | 12.12.2006 | MC | 31.12.2006 | BG | 02.02.2007 | GR | 03.02.2007 | PT | 02.04.2007 | HU | 03.05.2007 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | CZ | 02.11.2006 | |
EE | 02.11.2006 | ||
FI | 02.11.2006 | ||
IE | 02.11.2006 | ||
RO | 02.11.2006 | ||
SI | 02.11.2006 | ||
SK | 02.11.2006 | ||
TR | 02.11.2006 | ||
LU | 12.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 02.02.2007 | ||
GR | 03.02.2007 | ||
PT | 02.04.2007 | ||
HU | 03.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/32] | CZ | 02.11.2006 | |
EE | 02.11.2006 | ||
FI | 02.11.2006 | ||
IE | 02.11.2006 | ||
RO | 02.11.2006 | ||
SI | 02.11.2006 | ||
SK | 02.11.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 02.02.2007 | ||
GR | 03.02.2007 | ||
PT | 02.04.2007 | ||
HU | 03.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 02.11.2006 | |
EE | 02.11.2006 | ||
FI | 02.11.2006 | ||
IE | 02.11.2006 | ||
RO | 02.11.2006 | ||
SI | 02.11.2006 | ||
SK | 02.11.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 02.02.2007 | ||
GR | 03.02.2007 | ||
PT | 02.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | CZ | 02.11.2006 | |
FI | 02.11.2006 | ||
IE | 02.11.2006 | ||
RO | 02.11.2006 | ||
SI | 02.11.2006 | ||
SK | 02.11.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 02.02.2007 | ||
GR | 03.02.2007 | ||
PT | 02.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | CZ | 02.11.2006 | |
FI | 02.11.2006 | ||
IE | 02.11.2006 | ||
RO | 02.11.2006 | ||
SI | 02.11.2006 | ||
SK | 02.11.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 02.02.2007 | ||
PT | 02.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/42] | CZ | 02.11.2006 | |
FI | 02.11.2006 | ||
IE | 02.11.2006 | ||
RO | 02.11.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 02.02.2007 | ||
PT | 02.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/41] | CZ | 02.11.2006 | |
FI | 02.11.2006 | ||
RO | 02.11.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 02.02.2007 | ||
PT | 02.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/40] | CZ | 02.11.2006 | |
FI | 02.11.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 02.02.2007 | ||
PT | 02.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 02.11.2006 | |
BG | 02.02.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5711580 (BARCLAY HUGH WALTER [CA], et al) [X] 1-5 * column 2, line 59 - column 3, line 61 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]GB2330299 (SUNRISE MEDICAL LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-5 * page 4, line 24 - line 26 * * page 4, line 6 - line 13 * * page 4, line 2 - line 3 ** figures 1,2 * |