EP1437434 - Knitting tool and method of manufacturing thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 08.03.2017 [2017/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Groz-Beckert KG Parkweg 2 72458 Albstadt / DE | [2004/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jürgens, Eric Frongrabenweg 14 72406 Bisingen / DE | 02 /
Stingel, Uwe Wildensteinstrasse 28 72469 Messstetten / DE | [2004/29] | Representative(s) | Rüger Abel Patentanwälte PartGmbB Webergasse 3 73728 Esslingen a. N. / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/49] | Rüger, Barthelt & Abel Patentanwälte Webergasse 3 73728 Esslingen / DE | ||
Former [2004/29] | Patentanwälte Rüger, Barthelt & Abel Webergasse 3 73728 Esslingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 03028915.1 | 17.12.2003 | [2004/29] | Priority number, date | DE20031000830 | 10.01.2003 Original published format: DE 10300830 | [2004/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1437434 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1437434 | Date: | 02.12.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | D04B35/02 | [2004/29] | CPC: |
D04B35/02 (EP,US);
A47G9/0223 (KR);
D03D27/04 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, TR [2015/49] |
Former [2005/14] | DE, FR, GB, IT, TR | ||
Former [2004/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Strickwerkzeug und Herstellungsverfahren für dieses | [2004/29] | English: | Knitting tool and method of manufacturing thereof | [2004/29] | French: | Outil de tricotage et procédé pour former cet outil | [2004/29] | Examination procedure | 08.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/33] | 15.01.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.05.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK | 26.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.11.2009 | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.02.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.02.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.02.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 25.02.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 25.02.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 25.02.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 25.02.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 25.02.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.02.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 25.02.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 25.02.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 25.02.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 25.02.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.02.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 25.02.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 25.02.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 25.02.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.02.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 25.02.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.02.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 25.02.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2011 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   29.06.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 02.02.2016 | [2017/10] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1441591 (LA MONTAGNE PATRICK P) [A] 3,11 * page 2, lines 39-59; figures 3-5; claim 3 *; | [A]FR688926 (LEBOCEY FRERES ETS) [A] 3 * page 1, lines 46-53; figures 2,4; claim 2 *; | [A]DE2123971 (VYZKUMNY USTAV PLETARZSKY) [A] 1* page 6, line 6 - page 9, line 25; figures 12-21; claims 17-24 *; | [X]DE2944300 (SCHIEBER UNIVERSAL MASCHF [DE]) [X] 1,2,5-10 * page 7, line 22 - page 8, line 14; figures 1-4; claims 1,5 * | by applicant | US1441591 | FR688926 | DE2944300 | DE19740985 |