EP1432024 - Method of forming a penetration electrode and substrate having a penetration electrode [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.12.2015 [2015/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIKURA LTD. 5-1 Kiba 1-chome Kohtoh-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/26] | For all designated states FUJIKURA LTD. No. 5-1 Kiba 1-chome Kohtoh-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamamoto, Satoshi Fujikura Ltd. 5-1, Kiba 1-chome Kohtoh-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Takizawa, Takashi Fujikura Ltd. 5-1, Kiba 1-chome Kohtoh-ku Tokyo / JP | [2004/26] | Representative(s) | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/26] | Weitzel, Wolfgang, Dr.-Ing. Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patentanwälte Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 03028922.7 | 17.12.2003 | [2004/26] | Priority number, date | JP20020370201 | 20.12.2002 Original published format: JP 2002370201 | [2004/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1432024 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1432024 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | [2009/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/768 | [2004/26] | CPC: |
H01L21/76898 (EP,US);
H01L21/28 (KR);
H01L23/481 (EP,US);
H05K3/4038 (EP,US);
H05K3/4061 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
H01L2924/09701 (EP,US);
H05K1/0306 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0394 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/26] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Durchgangselektrode und Substrat mit einer Durchgangselektrode | [2004/26] | English: | Method of forming a penetration electrode and substrate having a penetration electrode | [2004/26] | French: | Procédé pour la formation d'une électrode de pénétration, substrat avec électrode de pénétration | [2004/26] | Examination procedure | 08.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/16] | 12.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/49] | 09.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.05.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 05.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2012 | 10   M06   Not yet paid | 31.12.2014 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6284627 (RAMM PETER [DE], et al) [X] 1,8-14 * the whole document *; | [X]WO0178120 (CREE INC [US], et al) [X] 1,4,8,11,12 * page 9, line 17 - line 18 * * page 10, line 7 - page 13, line 6; figures 1-11 *; | [DA]JP2002158191 (FUJIKURA LTD) [DA] 2 * abstract *; | [PX]WO03019653 (SCHOTT GLAS [DE], et al) [PX] 1,3,6-9,11,12 * page 27, line 23 - page 28, line 3 * * page 33, line 13 - page 35, line 2; figures 1a,3a-d *; | [E]EP1376678 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [E] 1,4,5,8-14* column 9, paragraph 53 - column 11, paragraph 69; figures 11a,12ab,13ab * |