EP1435634 - Safety switch for electrical kitchen device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2006/50] |
Former [2004/28] | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pavlovic, Henrik Okonina 37 3333 Ljubno ob Savinji / SI | 02 /
Sedovsek, Aleksander Nove trate 6 3330 Mozirje / SI | 03 /
Semeja, Uros Letus 42a 3327 Smartno ob Paki / SI | 04 /
Zibret, Igor Recica ob Paki 13 3327 Smartno ob Paki / SI | [2004/28] | Application number, filing date | 03029041.5 | 16.12.2003 | [2004/28] | Priority number, date | DE2002161369 | 30.12.2002 Original published format: DE 10261369 | [2004/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1435634 | Date: | 07.07.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1435634 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | [2005/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1435634 | Date: | 13.12.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01H27/00, A47J19/02, H01H3/16, H01H21/28, A47J43/07 | [2005/37] | CPC: |
A47J43/0766 (EP);
H01H3/16 (EP);
H01H21/24 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2004/28] | H01H27/00, A47J19/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/28] | Title | German: | Sicherheitsschalter für elektrisches Küchengerät | [2004/28] | English: | Safety switch for electrical kitchen device | [2004/28] | French: | Interrupteur de sécurité pour appareil de cuisine | [2004/28] | Examination procedure | 14.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/19] | 14.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 13.12.2006 | CZ | 13.12.2006 | DK | 13.12.2006 | EE | 13.12.2006 | FI | 13.12.2006 | IE | 13.12.2006 | RO | 13.12.2006 | SK | 13.12.2006 | LU | 16.12.2006 | BE | 31.12.2006 | MC | 31.12.2006 | BG | 13.03.2007 | SE | 13.03.2007 | GR | 14.03.2007 | ES | 24.03.2007 | PT | 14.05.2007 | HU | 14.06.2007 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | CZ | 13.12.2006 | |
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
EE | 13.12.2006 | ||
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
IE | 13.12.2006 | ||
RO | 13.12.2006 | ||
SK | 13.12.2006 | ||
LU | 16.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 13.03.2007 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
GR | 14.03.2007 | ||
ES | 24.03.2007 | ||
PT | 14.05.2007 | ||
HU | 14.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/32] | CZ | 13.12.2006 | |
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
EE | 13.12.2006 | ||
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
IE | 13.12.2006 | ||
RO | 13.12.2006 | ||
SK | 13.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 13.03.2007 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
GR | 14.03.2007 | ||
ES | 24.03.2007 | ||
PT | 14.05.2007 | ||
HU | 14.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 13.12.2006 | |
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
EE | 13.12.2006 | ||
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
IE | 13.12.2006 | ||
RO | 13.12.2006 | ||
SK | 13.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 13.03.2007 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
GR | 14.03.2007 | ||
ES | 24.03.2007 | ||
PT | 14.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | CZ | 13.12.2006 | |
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
IE | 13.12.2006 | ||
RO | 13.12.2006 | ||
SK | 13.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 13.03.2007 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
GR | 14.03.2007 | ||
ES | 24.03.2007 | ||
PT | 14.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | CZ | 13.12.2006 | |
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
IE | 13.12.2006 | ||
RO | 13.12.2006 | ||
SK | 13.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 13.03.2007 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
ES | 24.03.2007 | ||
PT | 14.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | CZ | 13.12.2006 | |
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
IE | 13.12.2006 | ||
RO | 13.12.2006 | ||
SK | 13.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 13.03.2007 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
ES | 24.03.2007 | ||
PT | 14.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/42] | CZ | 13.12.2006 | |
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
IE | 13.12.2006 | ||
RO | 13.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 13.03.2007 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
ES | 24.03.2007 | ||
PT | 14.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/41] | CZ | 13.12.2006 | |
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
RO | 13.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 13.03.2007 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
ES | 24.03.2007 | ||
PT | 14.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/40] | CZ | 13.12.2006 | |
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 13.03.2007 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
ES | 24.03.2007 | ||
PT | 14.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 13.12.2006 | |
BG | 13.03.2007 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2415354 (LUCAS INDUSTRIES LTD [GB]) [A] 1* figure 1 *; | [A]EP0599002 (EATON GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 3 *; | [A]US6375102 (BOULEAU JEAN-PAUL [FR], et al) [A] 1 * column 5, line 42 - line 67; figure - * |