EP1431106 - Collapsible seat [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.2009 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.03.2009 [2009/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADAM OPEL AG 65423 Rüsselsheim / DE | [2008/14] |
Former [2004/26] | For all designated states ADAM OPEL AG 65423 Rüsselsheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leopold, Frank Am Knittelberg 5 65232 Taunusstein-Orlen / DE | 02 /
Schlamann, Hermann-Walter Wallertheimerstrasse 22c 55288 Armsheim / DE | [2004/26] | Application number, filing date | 03029135.5 | 18.12.2003 | [2004/26] | Priority number, date | DE2002159854 | 20.12.2002 Original published format: DE 10259854 | [2004/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1431106 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1431106 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/36, B60N2/30 | [2004/26] | CPC: |
B60N2/3093 (EP);
B60N2/3013 (EP);
B60N2/3056 (EP);
B60N2/309 (EP);
B60N2/36 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [2005/11] |
Former [2004/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Klappbarer Sitz | [2004/26] | English: | Collapsible seat | [2004/26] | French: | Siège pliable | [2004/26] | Examination procedure | 16.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/06] | 24.12.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 01.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 11.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 31.01.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2000153728 ; | [A]US3202453 (RICHARDS JESSE W) [A] 1-3,5,7-9,11 * the whole document *; | [A]US6113191 (SEIBOLD KURT ALAN [US]) [A] 1-6,11 * column 2, line 61 - column 5, line 3; figures 3-5 *; | [X]US6234553 (ESCHELBACH RANDY GLENN [US], et al) [X] 1,5,9,11 * column 2, line 32 - column 3, line 24 * * column 3, line 50 - line 58 * * figures 1-3,5 *; | [XP]FR2829441 (RENAULT [FR]) [XP] 1-3,5,6,9,11 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20001013), vol. 2000, no. 09, & JP2000153728 A 20000606 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1,2,9,11 * abstract * | by applicant | DE10047742 |