EP1432045 - Optocoupler and its manufacturing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.11.2007 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TDK Corporation 1-13-1, Nihonbashi, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8272 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/26] | For all designated states TDK Corporation 1-13-1, Nihonbashi, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8272 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lo, Adrian Wing Fai c/o TDK Corporation 1-13-1, Nihonbashi Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8272 / JP | 02 /
Hata, Kenjiro c/o TDK Corporation 1-13-1, Nihonbashi Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8272 / JP | 03 /
Kineri, Tohru c/o TDK Corporation 1-13-1, Nihonbashi Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8272 / JP | 04 /
Hanashima, Naoki c/o TDK Corporation 1-13-1, Nihonbashi Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8272 / JP | [2004/26] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/26] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03029205.6 | 18.12.2003 | [2004/26] | Priority number, date | JP20020366940 | 18.12.2002 Original published format: JP 2002366940 | [2004/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1432045 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/26] | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/12 | [2004/26] | CPC: |
H01L31/12 (EP,US);
G02B6/4214 (EP,US);
G02B6/4246 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Optokoppler und sein Herstellungsverfahren | [2004/26] | English: | Optocoupler and its manufacturing method | [2004/26] | French: | Photocoupleur et procédé de fabrication | [2004/26] | Examination procedure | 23.11.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |