EP1415562 - A mechanical fastener [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/42] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2004/19] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aamondt, Jennifer M. Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
Berg, James G. Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
Cullen, Peter F. Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
Hargrett, Brian T. Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2004/20] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/19] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03029226.2 | 12.08.1999 | [2004/19] | Priority number, date | US19990290751 | 13.04.1999 Original published format: US 290751 | [2004/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1415562 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1415562 | Date: | 18.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A44B18/00 | [2004/19] | CPC: |
A44B18/0065 (EP,US);
A44B18/0049 (EP,US);
A44B18/0061 (EP,US);
B29C43/222 (EP,US);
B29C43/28 (EP,US);
B29C43/46 (EP,US);
B29C48/08 (EP,US);
B29C67/0044 (EP,US);
B29C2043/461 (EP,US);
B29C48/15 (EP,US);
B29L2031/729 (EP,US);
Y10T24/2742 (EP,US);
Y10T24/2775 (EP,US);
Y10T24/2792 (EP,US);
Y10T24/33 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24017 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/19] | Title | German: | Mechanischer Verschluss | [2004/19] | English: | A mechanical fastener | [2004/19] | French: | Fermeture mecanique | [2004/19] | Examination procedure | 19.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/51] | 21.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99942144.9 / EP1176884 | Divisional application(s) | EP06018385.2 / EP1733640 | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4454183 (WOLLMAN SANDFORD L [US]) [A] 1,2 * column 2, lines 11-43; figure - *; | [X]US5235731 (ANZAI SEIO [JP], et al) [X] 3,4* abstract *; | [X]US5398387 (TORIGOE SHINJI [JP], et al) [X] 3,4 * column 5, lines 7-34; figures 1a,2a,2b,2d,2e *; | [A]US5713111 (HATTORI JIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * abstract * |