EP1433939 - Engine fuel injection control device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.11.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2 Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/27] | For all designated states Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. 2 Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Katoh, Hiroshi 3-4-5-411, Kamioookanishi, Kounan-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Sato, Ritsuo 3-9-28-306, Baba, Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [2004/27] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/27] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03029245.2 | 18.12.2003 | [2004/27] | Priority number, date | JP20020369838 | 20.12.2002 Original published format: JP 2002369838 | [2004/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1433939 | Date: | 30.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1433939 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | [2008/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/06, F02D41/04 | [2004/27] | CPC: |
F02D41/047 (EP,US);
F02D41/064 (EP,US);
F02D2200/1012 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/36] |
Former [2004/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kraftstoffeinspritzsteuerungsvorrichtung für eine Brennkraftmaschine | [2004/27] | English: | Engine fuel injection control device | [2004/27] | French: | Dispositif de commande d'injection de carburant pour moteur à combustion interne | [2004/27] | Examination procedure | 18.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/27] | 04.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 31.07.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 27.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/50] | 18.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/50] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.03.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2014 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5497752 (SAGISAKA YASUO [JP], et al) [X] 1-18* column 6, line 1 - line 27; figures 6a,6b * | Examination | GB2334348 | WO0005495 | by applicant | US5497752 | JPH11173188 |