EP1544815 - Method for billing a service in a communication network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.08.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.09.2006 [2006/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/25] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Held, Walter Jeschkenstrasse 165 82538 Geretsried / DE | [2005/25] | Application number, filing date | 03029455.7 | 19.12.2003 | [2005/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1544815 | Date: | 22.06.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G07F19/00, G06F17/00, H04L29/06 | [2005/25] | CPC: |
H04L12/1403 (EP,US);
H04L12/14 (US);
H04L12/1467 (EP,US);
H04L63/0892 (EP);
H04L67/562 (EP);
H04L9/40 (US);
H04L63/0807 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | [2006/11] |
Former [2005/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Vergebührung eines Dienstes in einem Kommunikationsnetz | [2005/25] | English: | Method for billing a service in a communication network | [2005/25] | French: | Procede pour la taxation d un service dans un reseau de communications | [2005/25] | Examination procedure | 23.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/39] | 12.05.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/39] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 14.02.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.02.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.02.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 14.02.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 14.02.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 14.02.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 14.02.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.02.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 14.02.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.02.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 14.02.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 14.02.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 14.02.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 14.02.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 14.02.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 14.02.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.02.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.02.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 14.02.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 14.02.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 14.02.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.02.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 14.02.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.02.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 14.02.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 14.02.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 14.02.2006 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2005 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE10025565 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-13* column 3, line 35 - column 4, line 10 *; | [X]US2002165783 (GONTHIER JEAN-CHARLES [CA], et al) [X] 1-9,13,14 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0078] *; | [A]EP1349359 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0033] *; | [X]EP1361550 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 10-12 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0031] * * claim 5 * |