EP1435424 - Glass wall [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Steindl Glas GmbH Gries 303 6361 Itter / AT | [2004/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eisenbach, Heinz Ried 53 6363 Wesentdorf / DE | [2004/28] | Representative(s) | Binder, Armin Neue Bahnhofstrasse 16 89335 Ichenhausen / DE | [2004/28] | Application number, filing date | 03029597.6 | 23.12.2003 | [2004/28] | Priority number, date | DE2003100240 | 04.01.2003 Original published format: DE 10300240 | [2004/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1435424 | Date: | 07.07.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1435424 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | E06B3/62, E06B5/16, E06B3/54 | [2004/28] | CPC: |
E06B3/5427 (EP);
E06B3/5436 (EP);
E06B3/6202 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/28] | Title | German: | Glaswand | [2004/28] | English: | Glass wall | [2004/28] | French: | Paroi vitrée | [2004/28] | Examination procedure | 22.04.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/06] | 23.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/45] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 30.11.2005 | EE | 30.11.2005 | FI | 30.11.2005 | FR | 30.11.2005 | GB | 30.11.2005 | IE | 30.11.2005 | IT | 30.11.2005 | NL | 30.11.2005 | RO | 30.11.2005 | SI | 30.11.2005 | SK | 30.11.2005 | TR | 30.11.2005 | CY | 23.12.2005 | BE | 31.12.2005 | MC | 31.12.2005 | LU | 30.01.2006 | BG | 28.02.2006 | DK | 28.02.2006 | GR | 28.02.2006 | SE | 28.02.2006 | ES | 13.03.2006 | PT | 02.05.2006 | HU | 01.06.2006 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/45] | CZ | 30.11.2005 | |
EE | 30.11.2005 | ||
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
GB | 30.11.2005 | ||
IE | 30.11.2005 | ||
IT | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
RO | 30.11.2005 | ||
SI | 30.11.2005 | ||
SK | 30.11.2005 | ||
TR | 30.11.2005 | ||
CY | 23.12.2005 | ||
BE | 31.12.2005 | ||
FR | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
LU | 30.01.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.03.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
HU | 01.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/41] | CZ | 30.11.2005 | |
EE | 30.11.2005 | ||
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
GB | 30.11.2005 | ||
IE | 30.11.2005 | ||
IT | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
RO | 30.11.2005 | ||
SI | 30.11.2005 | ||
SK | 30.11.2005 | ||
TR | 30.11.2005 | ||
CY | 23.12.2005 | ||
BE | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
LU | 30.01.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.03.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
HU | 01.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/40] | CZ | 30.11.2005 | |
EE | 30.11.2005 | ||
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
GB | 30.11.2005 | ||
IE | 30.11.2005 | ||
IT | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
SI | 30.11.2005 | ||
SK | 30.11.2005 | ||
TR | 30.11.2005 | ||
CY | 23.12.2005 | ||
BE | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
LU | 30.01.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.03.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
HU | 01.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/20] | CZ | 30.11.2005 | |
EE | 30.11.2005 | ||
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
GB | 30.11.2005 | ||
IE | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
SI | 30.11.2005 | ||
SK | 30.11.2005 | ||
TR | 30.11.2005 | ||
CY | 23.12.2005 | ||
BE | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
LU | 30.01.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.03.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
HU | 01.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | CZ | 30.11.2005 | |
EE | 30.11.2005 | ||
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
GB | 30.11.2005 | ||
IE | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
SI | 30.11.2005 | ||
SK | 30.11.2005 | ||
TR | 30.11.2005 | ||
BE | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
LU | 30.01.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.03.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
HU | 01.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | CZ | 30.11.2005 | |
EE | 30.11.2005 | ||
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
GB | 30.11.2005 | ||
IE | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
SI | 30.11.2005 | ||
SK | 30.11.2005 | ||
TR | 30.11.2005 | ||
BE | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
LU | 30.01.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.03.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | CZ | 30.11.2005 | |
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
IE | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
SI | 30.11.2005 | ||
SK | 30.11.2005 | ||
TR | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
BG | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.03.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | CZ | 30.11.2005 | |
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
IE | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
SI | 30.11.2005 | ||
SK | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
BG | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.03.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | CZ | 30.11.2005 | |
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
IE | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
SI | 30.11.2005 | ||
SK | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
BG | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | CZ | 30.11.2005 | |
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
IE | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
SK | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
BG | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | CZ | 30.11.2005 | |
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
SK | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/35] | CZ | 30.11.2005 | |
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
SK | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 30.11.2005 | |
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 30.11.2005 | |
NL | 30.11.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2077287 (GLAVERBEL) [X] 1-7,10-15 * page 1, line 1 - page 7, line 14; figures 7,17 *; | [AD]DE19542040 (ANGELMAHR WERNER [AT]) [AD] 1-15* the whole document *; | [AD]EP1143097 (STEINDL GLAS GMBH [AT]) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document * |